Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Claire V Eagan
Referred: Mark T Steele
Case #: 4:24-cv-00544
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 3:50 AM CDT
Defendant
FPI Management
Represented By
Brooks R. Cain
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Ellen Richards
Represented By
Brooks R. Cain
O'Hagan Meyer PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shanika Crowley
306 W 62ND PL N
TULSA, OK 74126
Represented By
Haley Lynn Simmoneau
Athena Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Emanuel Kataev
Sage Legal LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
38 38 motion Stay Wed 05/21 1:28 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case Pending Arbitration by FPI Management, Ellen Richards (Cain, Brooks)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
37 37 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/18 10:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Before the Court is defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time 36 which is granted. Defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading no later than 5/23/2025 as requested. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 5/23/2025); granting36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Complaint
36 36 motion Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/18 9:59 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] by FPI Management, Ellen Richards (Cain, Brooks)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Complaint
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
35 35 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/19 10:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Before the Court is defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time 34 which is granted. Defendants shall file their answer or other responsive pleading no later than 4/21/2025 as requested. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 4/21/2025); granting34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Complaint
34 34 motion Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/19 10:17 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] by FPI Management, Ellen Richards (Cain, Brooks)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Complaint
Monday, February 24, 2025
33 33 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 02/24 3:22 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ellen Richards (Cain, Brooks)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Mon 02/24 3:20 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FPI Management (Cain, Brooks)
Related: [-]
31 31 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Mon 02/24 8:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing FPI Management and Ellen Richards to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
30 30 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Documents - Link to Document(s) Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/17 2:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Before the Court is defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time (Dkt. # 29) which is granted. Defendants are directed to file their answer or other responsive pleading to plaintiff's amended complaint (Dkt. # 21) no later than March 20, 2025 as requested. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 3/20/2025); granting29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Complaint
29 29 motion Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/17 11:29 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Related [+] by FPI Management, Ellen Richards [Note: Attorney Brooks R. Cain added to party FPI Management (pty:dft), Attorney Brooks R. Cain added to party Ellen Richards(pty:dft).] (Cain, Brooks)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Complaint
Monday, February 03, 2025
28 28 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/03 2:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: FPI Management Related [+] by Shanika Crowley (Kataev, Emanuel)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Complaint
27 27 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 02/03 2:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ellen Richards Related [+] by Shanika Crowley (Kataev, Emanuel)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Complaint
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
26 26 service Summons Issued Wed 01/29 1:37 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to FPI Management (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
25 25 service Summons Issued Fri 01/24 4:07 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/24 1:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Shanika Crowley (Kataev, Emanuel)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
23 23 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 01/17 10:45 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Emanuel Kataev on behalf of Shanika Crowley (Kataev, Emanuel)
Related: [-]
22 22 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Fri 01/17 10:10 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Plaintiff has had counsel enter appearances and file the amended complaint 21 ; in forma pauperis is revoked; plaintiff must serve defendants with amended complaint. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 21 Amended Complaint
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/17 8:26 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against FPI Management, Ellen Richards Related [+] by Shanika Crowley [Note: Attorney Emanuel Kataev added to party Shanika Crowley(pty:pla).] (Kataev, Emanuel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, January 06, 2025
20 20 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Mon 01/06 9:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Counsel Haley Simmoneau for plaintiff shall note and forward to pro hac vice counsel Emanuel Katev copies of both 10 which allowed counsel Katev to appear pro hac vice and directed entry of appearance to be filed forthwith, and a copy of the recent minute order 19 setting additional deadline. Counsel Simmoneau shall file certification of mailing to counsel Katev due forthwith. Related [+] (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 10 Order,,, Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, 19 Minute Order,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),, Ruling on Motion to Reconsider,8 Appearance - Attorney
Friday, January 03, 2025
19 19 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Ruling on Motion to Reconsider Fri 01/03 11:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Dkt. # 11) is granted; plaintiff may file an amended complaint by 1/17/25, and effect service on defendants ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/17/2025); granting11 Motion to Reconsider (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
18 18 appeal Mandate from Circuit Court Thu 01/02 11:10 AM
MANDATE from Circuit Court Related [+] (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 17 Decision from Circuit Court,13 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court
17 17 appeal Decision from Circuit Court Thu 01/02 10:54 AM
DECISION from Circuit Court dismissing the Appeal Related [+] (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court
Monday, December 16, 2024
16 16 order 01 - Order Directing - Court Clerk to Take Action Documents - Link to Document(s) Mon 12/16 9:33 AM
ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - The court clerk shall leave plaintiff's motion to reconsider (Dkt. # 11) pending until the Tenth Circuit rules on plaintiff's interlocutory appeal. The court clerk shall forward a copy of this order to the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals as related to Case No. 24-5143 , directing court clerk to take action Related [+] (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 15 Appeal Number Information from Circuit Court,6 Order,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,11 MOTION to Reconsider ,13 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court
utility Remark Mon 12/16 9:38 AM
***Remark: Emailed a copy of order (#16) to CA10_Team2@ca10.uscourts.gov Related [+] (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 16 Order,,, Directing Court Clerk to Take Action,,,,,
Friday, December 13, 2024
15 15 appeal Appeal Number Information from Circuit Court Fri 12/13 1:22 PM
APPEAL NUMBER INFORMATION from Circuit Court assigning Case Number 24-5143 #13 Related [+] (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court
14 14 appeal Preliminary Record Sent Fri 12/13 11:19 AM
PRELIMINARY RECORD Sent to Circuit Court Related [+] (With attachments) (dla, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court
Thursday, December 12, 2024
13 13 appeal Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court Thu 12/12 2:56 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Circuit Court (paid $605 appeal fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3122107) Related [+] by Shanika Crowley (Simmoneau, Haley)
Related: [-] 6 Order,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,
12 12 misc Declaration Thu 12/12 2:19 PM
DECLARATION in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration by Shanika Crowley (With attachments) (Simmoneau, Haley)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Reconsider Thu 12/12 2:16 PM
MOTION to Reconsider Related [+] by Shanika Crowley (Simmoneau, Haley)
Related: [-] 6 Order,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,
10 10 order 01 - Order Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/12 2:12 PM
ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Before the Court is the motion for admission pro hac vice (Dkt. # 9), which is hereby granted. Emanuel Kataev is admitted pro hac vice for the limited purpose of representing plaintiff in this matter. Counsel is directed to file a separate entry of appearance forthwith. Counsel is directed to become familiar with the Local Rules of this District, and shall note the pleading format of this Order for use on future pleadings and proposed orders. ; granting9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/12 1:20 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Emanuel Kataev to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $125 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3121920) by Shanika Crowley (Simmoneau, Haley)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance - Attorney Thu 12/12 12:54 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Haley Lynn Simmoneau on behalf of Shanika Crowley [Note: Attorney Haley Lynn Simmoneau added to party Shanika Crowley(pty:pla).] (Simmoneau, Haley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
6 6 order 01 - Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Tue 11/12 10:00 AM
ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. # 1) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. # 2) is granted. ; granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Related [+] (RGG, Chambers)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 10:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Shanika Crowley to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 11/08 4:27 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ellen Richards (atn, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
4 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Shanika Crowley to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 11/07 3:38 PM
SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to FPI Management (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed in Forma Pauperis Thu 11/07 3:34 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Shanika Crowley (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/07 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Shanika Crowley (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Thu 11/07 3:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Shanika Crowley to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]