California Southern District Court
Judge:Benjamin J Cheeks
Referred: Allison H Goddard
Case #: 3:24-cv-02091
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983cv Civil Rights Act - Civil Action for Deprivation of Rights
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 1:40 AM PDT
Defendant
Anthony Ray
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Emily Mims
Defendant
Pooja Mittal
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Jon Montgomery
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Ana Munoz
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Defendant
Naphcare
Represented By
David Fleck
Manning Kass
contact info
Eugene P Ramirez
Manning & Kass, Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
contact info
Natalie E. Ortiz
Manning Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester
contact info
Defendant
Bruce Pastner
Represented By
Katie Kay Schuler
Lotz, Doggett & Rawers
contact info
Emily Katelyn Kirschenheuter
Lotz Doggett & Rawers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Donato Preche
Defendant
Nas Rafi
Represented By
Katie Kay Schuler
Lotz, Doggett & Rawers
contact info
Emily Katelyn Kirschenheuter
Lotz Doggett & Rawers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Andrea Medina
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Richard Rhee
Defendant
Serina Rognlien-Hood
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Nicolaus Rosete
Represented By
Katie Kay Schuler
Lotz, Doggett & Rawers
contact info
Emily Katelyn Kirschenheuter
Lotz Doggett & Rawers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Silva Suaking
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Christine Sullivan
Represented By
Katie Kay Schuler
Lotz, Doggett & Rawers
contact info
Emily Katelyn Kirschenheuter
Lotz Doggett & Rawers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ellen Tanacio
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Stacy Thompson
Represented By
Katie Kay Schuler
Lotz, Doggett & Rawers
contact info
Emily Katelyn Kirschenheuter
Lotz Doggett & Rawers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Juancho Trinidad
Defendant
Kelly Martinez
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Yvonne Arce
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Wenyan Boyd
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Helen Breeler
Defendant
Justin Weiss
Represented By
Douglas S. De Heras
Prindle, Goetz, Barnes & Reinholtz, LLP
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Correctional Healthcare Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Katie Kay Schuler
Lotz, Doggett & Rawers
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Emily Katelyn Kirschenheuter
Lotz Doggett & Rawers LLP
contact info
Defendant
County of San Diego
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-22
Defendant
Jessica Flores
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Peter J. Freedland
Represented By
Katie Kay Schuler
Lotz, Doggett & Rawers
contact info
Emily Katelyn Kirschenheuter
Lotz Doggett & Rawers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Leah Gache
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
William Gore
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Yaowaluck Hagg
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Anil Kumar
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Samantha Macanlalay
Represented By
Lindsey M. Burnette
County Of San Diego
contact info
Steven Paul Inman, II
San Diego Office Of County Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Vincent Ciardullo
Represented By
Danielle Iredale
Iredale & Roth Apc
contact info
Owen Roth
Iredale & Roth Apc
contact info
Danielle Rachel Iredale
Law Office Of Danielle Iredale, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
64 64 respm Response in Support of Motion Thu 05/15 8:20 AM
RESPONSE in Support re48 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Naphcare. (Fleck, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
63 63 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/14 3:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re52 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim County Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint filed by Yvonne Arce, Wenyan Boyd, County of San Diego, Jessica Flores, Leah Gache, William Gore, Yaowaluck Hagg, Anil Kumar, Samantha Macanlalay, Kelly Martinez, Andrea Medina, Pooja Mittal, Jon Montgomery, Ana Munoz, Serina Rognlien-Hood, Silva Suaking, Ellen Tanacio.(Burnette, Lindsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service