New Jersey District Court
Judge:Esther Salas
Referred: Jessica S Allen
Case #: 2:24-cv-10377
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1331 Federal Question-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 4:59 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
CRISTINA TUMMILLO
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE
Mcdonnell & Associates, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
STEPHANIE SOROTA
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE
Mcdonnell & Associates, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
EMMA MUSCARELLE
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE
Mcdonnell & Associates, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
ELIZABETH FLYNN
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE
Mcdonnell & Associates, PC
contact info
Counter Claimant
STEPHANIE BUESSER
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE
Mcdonnell & Associates, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
APRIL T. VILLAVERDE
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info
Defendant
CRISTINA TUMMILLO
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE
Mcdonnell & Associates, PC
contact info
Defendant
SUSAN SOROTA
Represented By
NANCY E. LUCIANNA
contact info
Defendant
STEPHANIE SOROTA
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE
Mcdonnell & Associates, PC
contact info
Defendant
PETROV BALLET SCHOOL LLC
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
KAREN BOSCH PETROV
Defendant
EUGENE PETROV
Defendant
EMMA MUSCARELLE
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE
Mcdonnell & Associates, PC
contact info
Defendant
ELIZABETH FLYNN
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE
Mcdonnell & Associates, PC
contact info
Defendant
STEPHANIE BUESSER
Represented By
JOHN W. BALDANTE
Baldante & Rubenstein, P.C.
contact info
DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE
Mcdonnell & Associates, PC
contact info
Notice Only
PHV TIMOTHY W. BURNS
Notice Only
PHV BRIAN P. CAWLEY
Notice Only
PHV KARIN JONCH-CLAUSEN
Notice Only
PHV ORIS SHAFIRSTEIN
Plaintiff
MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By
APRIL T. VILLAVERDE
Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
44 44 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/16 4:20 PM
NOTICE by STEPHANIE BUESSER, ELIZABETH FLYNN, EMMA MUSCARELLE, STEPHANIE SOROTA, CRISTINA TUMMILLO Withdrawal of Appearance of Karin Jonch-Clausen(BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Service
Friday, April 04, 2025
43 43 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/04 9:04 AM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY re36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Service
Friday, March 28, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/28 11:45 AM
Reset Deadlines as to36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Motion set for 4/21/2025 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/26 10:45 AM
Set Deadlines as to42 MOTION for Joinder to Susan Sorota's Motion to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/21/2025 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
utility Motions No Longer Referred Tue 03/25 1:36 PM
42 MOTION for Joinder to Susan Sorota's Motion to Dismiss no longer referred to the Magistrate Judge. Motion to be decided by the District Judge. (jbb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
42 42 motion Joinder Mon 03/24 4:59 PM
MOTION for Joinder to Susan Sorota's Motion to Dismiss by STEPHANIE BUESSER, ELIZABETH FLYNN, EMMA MUSCARELLE, STEPHANIE SOROTA, CRISTINA TUMMILLO. (BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
41 41 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Fri 03/21 12:51 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
40 40 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 03/19 3:45 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ori Shafirstein to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Wed 03/19 4:37 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ORIS SHAFIRSTEIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
utility Motions No Longer Referred Fri 03/14 3:12 PM
15 Amended MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties re14 MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties no longer referred to the Magistrate Judge. Motion to be decided by the District Judge. (jbb)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Fri 03/14 5:09 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 250.00, receipt number NEW51638 as to ORI SHAFIRSTEIN. (ps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/12 10:47 AM
ORDER granting37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to ORI SHAFIRSTEIN, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 3/11/2025. (ld, )
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Exhibit (to Document) Tue 03/11 12:07 PM
Exhibit to37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, ADMISSION OF ORI SHAFIRSTEIN, ESQ. by All Plaintiffs. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/11 9:13 AM
Set Deadlines as to36 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . Motion set for 4/7/2025 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (wh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
37 37 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/10 1:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ADMISSION OF ORI SHAFIRSTEIN, ESQ. by All Plaintiffs.(VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification April's Certification In Support of PHV Admission,
Att: 2 Certification Ori's Certification in Support of PHV Admission,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
36 36 2 pgs motion Dismiss Mon 03/10 10:21 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by SUSAN SOROTA.(LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Affidavit of Attorney,
Att: 4 Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit B,
Att: 6 Exhibit C
Thursday, March 06, 2025
35 35 order Order Thu 03/06 4:54 PM
TEXT ORDER Please be advised that the Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/14/25 is adjourned pending all Defendants having answered, moved, or otherwise responded to the Complaint. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 3/6/2025. (Allen, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
34 34 1 pgs minutes Status Conference Wed 03/05 4:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/4/2025. (Court Reporter, Mary Jo Monteleone (973-645-3833)) (ek)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
33 33 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/28 11:39 AM
TEXT ORDER : The Court will hold a telephone conference on 3/4/2025 at 04:00 PM regarding defendant Susan Sorota's letter dated February 21, 2025 (D.E. No.32 ). So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 2/28/2025. (ek)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
32 32 2 pgs misc Letter Mon 02/24 11:40 AM
Letter from Susan Sorota. (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
31 31 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 10:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by NANCY E. LUCIANNA on behalf of SUSAN SOROTA (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
30 30 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/19 10:32 AM
ORDER granting28 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Susan Sorota; that Defendant(s) time to answer, move or otherwise reply is extended to March 19, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/18/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
29 29 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/19 10:25 AM
ORDER granting27 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Karen Bosch Petrov; that Defendant(s) time to answer, move or otherwise reply is extended to March 19, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/18/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
utility Remark (public) Tue 02/18 10:26 AM
CLERK'S TEXT ORDER -27 Application for Clerk's Order to Extend Time to Answer submitted by KAREN BOSCH PETROY has been DENIED because the application is asking for an extension after the reply time has passed. The Application has been forwarded to Chambers of Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen for further review. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
28 28 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 02/17 9:53 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Susan Sorota.. (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
27 27 1 pgs misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 02/14 11:14 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Karen Bosch Petrov.. (KLEINER, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 02/14 9:31 AM
CLERK'S TEXT ORDER -26 Application for Clerk's Order to Extend Time to Answer submitted by SUSAN SOROTA has been DENIED because the application is asking for an extension of more than fourteen (14) days which is beyond the scope of what the Clerk of the Court can grant. The Application has been forwarded to Chambers of Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen for further review. (adc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
26 26 3 pgs misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Wed 02/12 3:46 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Susan Sorota.. (LUCIANNA, NANCY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
25 25 12 pgs respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Tue 02/11 1:04 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EMMA MUSCARELLE, CRISTINA TUMMILLO, ELIZABETH FLYNN, STEPHANIE SOROTA, STEPHANIE BUESSER re15 Amended MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties re14 MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties (BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
24 24 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/04 2:47 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY re15 Amended MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties re14 MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to Counterclaim Mon 02/03 2:30 PM
ANSWER to Counterclaim by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY.(VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLA ROSEMARY PRICE on behalf of EMMA MUSCARELLE, CRISTINA TUMMILLO, ELIZABETH FLYNN, STEPHANIE SOROTA, STEPHANIE BUESSER (PRICE, DANIELLA)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
21 21 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 01/24 12:43 PM
LETTER ORDER scheduling an Initial Scheduling Conference for 3/14/2025 at 2:00 PM by way of Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen and will provide the parties with the connection information in advance. The parties shall submit a joint discovery plan to the Undersigned no later than 3/12/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/24/2025. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/23 9:55 AM
Set Deadlines as to15 Amended MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties re14 MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties . Motion set for 2/18/2025 before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 01/23 2:53 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ek)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
20 20 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/15 5:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affirmation of Mailing for Petrov Ballet School LLC c/o NJ Department of Treasury served on Petrov Ballet School LLC on 01/12/2025, filed by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/15 4:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affirmation of Mailing for Karen Bosch Petrov served on Karen Bosch Petrov on 01/08/2025, filed by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Wed 01/15 4:50 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affirmation of Mailing for Eugene Petrov served on Eugene Petrov on 01/08/2025, filed by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order Wed 01/15 2:32 PM
LETTER ORDER granting request for the withdrawal the Motion (Document No. 14) as it was submitted in error. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 1/15/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/15 11:02 AM
Set Deadlines as to14 MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties ,15 Amended MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties re14 MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties . Motion set for 2/18/2025 before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
16 16 misc Letter Tue 01/14 4:32 PM
Letter from John W. Baldante re14 MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties . (BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/14 11:40 AM
Amended MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties re14 MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties by EMMA MUSCARELLE, CRISTINA TUMMILLO, ELIZABETH FLYNN, STEPHANIE BUESSER, STEPHANIE SOROTA.(BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Amended Brief in Support of Motion to Drop Dispensable Parties,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Tue 01/14 10:31 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, KARIN JONCH-CLAUSEN, BRIAN P. CAWLEY and TIMOTHY W. BURNS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
14 14 3 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/13 4:33 PM
MOTION to Drop Dispensable Parties by EMMA MUSCARELLE, CRISTINA TUMMILLO, ELIZABETH FLYNN, STEPHANIE BUESSER, STEPHANIE SOROTA.(BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Drop Dispensable Parties,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
13 13 41 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Mon 01/13 4:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY by CRISTINA TUMMILLO, ELIZABETH FLYNN, STEPHANIE SOROTA, STEPHANIE BUESSER, EMMA MUSCARELLE.(BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 01/13 2:29 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Karin Jonch-Clausen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 01/13 2:28 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brian P. Cawley to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 01/13 2:27 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Timothy W. Burns to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Tue 01/07 11:52 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee received as to TIMOTHY W. BURNS, BRIAN P. CAWLEY, and KARIN JONCH-CLAUSEN: $ 750, receipt number TRE141986 (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 12/23 5:06 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to BRIAN P. CAWLEY, ESQ., AND KARIN JNCH-CLAUSEN, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 12/23/2024. (ld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
8 8 4 pgs motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/17 3:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by EMMA MUSCARELLE, PETROV BALLET SCHOOL LLC, CRISTINA TUMMILLO, ELIZABETH FLYNN, STEPHANIE BUESSER, STEPHANIE SOROTA.(BALDANTE, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration Burns Esq,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration Cawley Esq,
Att: 3 Declaration Declaration Jonch-Clausen Esq,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh A Burns COGS,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh B Cawley COGS,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh C Jonch-Clausen COGS,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service,
Att: 8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/17 5:08 PM
Set Deadlines as to8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 1/21/2025 before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 12/05 12:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/19 2:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY. STEPHANIE BUESSER waiver sent on 11/12/2024, answer due 1/13/2025; ELIZABETH FLYNN waiver sent on 11/12/2024, answer due 1/13/2025; CRISTINA TUMMILLO waiver sent on 11/12/2024, answer due 1/13/2025. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/19 2:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY. EMMA MUSCARELLE waiver sent on 11/12/2024, answer due 1/13/2025; STEPHANIE SOROTA waiver sent on 11/12/2024, answer due 1/13/2025. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 11/12 9:35 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to STEPHANIE BUESSER, ELIZABETH FLYNN, EMMA MUSCARELLE, EUGENE PETROV, KAREN BOSCH PETROV, PETROV BALLET SCHOOL LLC, STEPHANIE SOROTA, SUSAN SOROTA, CRISTINA TUMMILLO. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 09, 2024
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Sat 11/09 8:19 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information - Parties are to be entered in all capital letters. Also, in the future when choosing parties, please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Sat 11/09 8:23 AM
Case assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
3 3 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 11/07 6:43 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Thu 11/07 6:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY as Corporate Parent.. (VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/07 6:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number BNJDC-15794989), filed by MARKEL INSURANCE COMPANY.(VILLAVERDE, APRIL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Order for Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Consent Judgment with Exhibits,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - 2010-15 Primary Policies Abuse Exclusion,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - 2015-20 Primary Policies Abuse Exclusion,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Miscellaneous Professional Liability Endorsement,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Umbrella Abuse Exclusion,
Att: 7 Summons Summons with Appendix A,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet