1
|
|
1
Sealed Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead as to Raymond Stavig (1). (sb) [3:24-mj-00222]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint
|
4
|
|
4
ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Seal Criminal Complaint, Arrest Warrant, and Related Materials as to Raymond Stavig (1). Signed on 10/11/24 by Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. (Copies e-mailed to counsel on 10/11/2024.) (sb) [3:24-mj-00222]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
Minutes of Proceedings : First Appearance before Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You as to Raymond Stavig (USM #42036-511) held on 10/18/2024. Government's oral unopposed motion to unseal case is granted. AFPD Michelle Sweet present for AFPD Megha Desai. Order appointing AFPD Megha Desai as counsel. Defendant advised of rights and waives a preliminary hearing. Detention hearing held. Government requests detention on both flight/danger. Defendant requests a detention hearing be scheduled. Defendant's Location-Custody status is: detained pending further hearing. Brady Disclosure Order: Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the government is advised of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. See attached Order. ORDER: SETTING a Review of Detention Hearing for Monday, 10/21/2024 at 1:30PM in Portland before the duty magistrate judge. FURTHER ORDER: Arraignment is set for Friday, 11/15/2024 at 1:30PM in Portland before the duty magistrate judge. Counsel for the defendant is encouraged to discuss with the defendant the option to waive arraignment in accordance with Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 10(b). Any waiver of arraignment should be filed with the Court once the defendant has been charged by Indictment or Information and ahead of the scheduled arraignment date. Counsel Present for Government: Nicholas Meyers for Nathan Bender. Counsel Present for Defendant: Michelle Sweet for Megha Desai. Restraint Order: NR. (Court Reporter Bonita Shumway) (pvh) [3:24-mj-00222]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Defendant Raymond Stavig (USM #42036-511). Signed on 10/18/2024 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh) [3:24-mj-00222]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
Minutes of Proceedings: Status Hearing re: Review of Detention before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo as to Defendant Raymond Stavig (USM #42036-511) held 10/21/24. Defendant released on conditions. Counsel Present for Government: Nathan Bender. Counsel Present for Defendant: Michelle Sweet (for Megha Desai). (Court Reporter: Kellie Humiston) (gm) [3:24-mj-00222]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
Order Setting Conditions of Release as to Defendant Raymond Stavig. Signed on 10/21/2024 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (kemc). (cw). [3:24-mj-00222]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(10/22/2024) Attachment Release order signed by the defendant
|
9
|
|
9
Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 10/18/2024 as to Raymond Stavig. (sb) [3:24-mj-00222]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
Indictment Related [+] as to Raymond Stavig (1).
Count 1: Felon in Possession of Firearm
(Forfeiture Allegation.) (ecp)
Related: [-] dacted
|
11
|
|
11
Indictment Unredacted Version Filed Under Seal as to Defendant Raymond Stavig. (ecp)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
Defendant Information Relative to a Criminal Case Sheet as to Defendant Raymond Stavig. (In accordance with Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1 this form document containing personal data identifiers is filed under seal) . (ecp)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp)
Related: [-]
|