Nevada District Court
Judge:James C Mahan
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:24-cv-02087
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Nov 07, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 1:58 AM PDT
Defendant
SeatGeek, Inc.
Represented By
Michael N Feder
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Aarti Reddy
Cooley LLP
contact info
Christopher Michael Andrews
Cooley LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mars Carbonell
Represented By
Stefan Bogdanovich
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Michael J Gayan
Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP
contact info
Philip Fraietta
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Michael J. Gayan
Claggett & Sykes Law Firm
contact info
Nathanael R Rulis
Kemp, Jones & Coulthard, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
44 44 respm Response Mon 05/05 9:33 AM
RESPONSE to42 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages, by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. Replies due by 5/12/2025. (Feder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
43 43 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Wed 04/23 7:23 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re42 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages, by Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
42 42 motion Motion Leave to File Document/Excess Pages Tue 04/22 2:20 PM
Supplemental MOTION for Leave to File Document re25 Response, by Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. Responses due by 5/6/2025.(Gayan, Michael) (nondispositive)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
41 41 misc QC Notice Tue 04/08 9:23 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Christopher Andrews and Aarti Reddy are in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to complete the registration. (no image attached) (LE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
40 40 7 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 3:54 PM
ORDER Granting15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aarti Reddy for SeatGeek, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael Feder. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/3/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
39 39 7 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/03 3:48 PM
ORDER Granting16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Andrews for SeatGeek, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael Feder. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/3/2025. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 04/01 2:25 PM
ORDER Granting37 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nathanael R Rulis withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/1/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
37 37 motion Motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/31 11:04 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kemp Jones LLP for Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. Responses due by 4/14/2025. (Rulis, Nathanael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Case ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/24 3:41 PM
ORDER Granting28 Motion to Stay Discovery. In the event resolution of the motion to compel arbitration or to dismiss does not end the proceedings here, the parties must file a joint proposed discovery plan or joint status report within 14 days of the issuance of that order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/24/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
35 35 respm Response Wed 02/19 1:44 PM
RESPONSE to34 Motion to Strike by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. Replies due by 2/26/2025. (Feder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
34 34 motion Motion Strike Wed 02/12 4:57 PM
MOTION to Strike33 Reply by Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. Responses due by 2/26/2025. (Gayan, Michael) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
33 33 respm Reply Tue 02/11 4:14 PM
REPLY to Response to17 Motion to Compel,, by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc..(Feder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Declaration - Paula Giuliani,
Att: 2 Exhibit F,
Att: 3 Exhibit G
Friday, February 07, 2025
32 32 notice Notice Other Fri 02/07 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Affiliation by Mars Carbonell. (Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
31 31 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 01/30 12:14 PM
ORDER granting27 Stipulation to File Reply in Support of17 Motion to Compel. Replies due by 2/11/2025. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/30/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
30 30 minord Minute Order Thu 01/30 10:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/30/2025. Defendant filed an unopposed motion to stay discovery on an emergency basis. Docket No.28 . The Court defers ruling on that motion at this time given that briefing on the underlying motion practice has not been completed. In the interim, however, the Court extends the deadline to file a discovery plan to March 4, 2025. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
29 29 respm Non-Opposition to Motion Wed 01/29 3:35 PM
NON-OPPOSITION to28 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. (Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Motion Stay Case or Discovery Wed 01/29 11:35 AM
Emergency MOTION to Stay Discovery re17 Motion to Compel,, by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. Responses due by 2/12/2025. (Feder, Michael)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Stipulation Wed 01/29 11:02 AM
First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, To Dismiss the Complaint re25 Response, by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. (Feder, Michael) (extend) (sumjgm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
26 26 misc Request Judicial Notice Tue 01/28 3:56 PM
REQUEST for Judicial Notice re25 Response, by Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. (Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Response Tue 01/28 3:54 PM
RESPONSE to17 Motion to Compel,, by Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. Replies due by 2/4/2025.(Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J
Monday, January 27, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Case Tue 01/28 7:42 AM
ORDER DENYING without prejudice23 Motion to stay discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/27/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Motion Stay Case or Discovery Mon 01/27 4:00 PM
Emergency MOTION to Stay Discovery re17 Motion to Compel,, by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. Responses due by 2/10/2025.(Feder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Aarit Reddy
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
22 22 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Tue 01/21 9:18 AM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re16 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Christopher M. Andrews, by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Feder, Michael)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Tue 01/21 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re15 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition for attorney Aarti Reddy, by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Feder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
20 20 minord Minute Order Wed 01/15 3:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 1/15/2025. By Deputy Clerk: C. Torres. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel 15 and 16 are DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners, Aarti Reddy and Christopher M. Andrews shall amend the petitions to reflect all the state bars and memberships they are apart of on page #3 question # 7. Petitioners shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event and link to documents 15 and 16 in accordance with the local rules. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Motion Dismiss Wed 01/15 9:56 AM
ERROR: Duplicative of 17 Motion. MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint,, by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. Responses due by 1/29/2025.(Feder, Michael) Modified on 1/15/2025 (HAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Paula Giuliani,
Att: 2 Index,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - TOU dated 07.01.23,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - TOU dated 09.26.23,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Checkout Flow,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - SeatGeek Account Sign Up Prompt,
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Terms of Use Email
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
18 18 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 01/14 4:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by SeatGeek, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Feder, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Motion Compel Tue 01/14 4:12 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration, or Alternatively, To Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint re1 Complaint,, by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. Responses due by 1/28/2025.(Feder, Michael) (arbitration)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Paula Giuliani,
Att: 2 Index Exhibit Index,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - TOU dated 07.01.23,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - TOU dated 09.26.23,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Checkout Flow,
Att: 6 Exhibit D - SeatGeek Account Sign Up Prompt,
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Terms of Use Email
16 16 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Tue 01/14 2:50 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher M. Andrews and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7924901) by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Tue 01/14 2:48 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Aarti Reddy and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7924879) by Defendant SeatGeek, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
14 14 13 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/04 11:45 AM
ORDER granting10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Philip Fraietta and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael J. Gayan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/3/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
13 13 notice Notice Corrected Image/Document Wed 11/27 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re10 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney Philip L. Fraietta, by Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
12 12 8 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 12:35 PM
ORDER Granting9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stefan Bogdanovich and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael J. Gayan. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/25/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
11 11 minord Minute Order Fri 11/22 1:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 11/22/2024. By Deputy Clerk: C. Torres. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel 10 is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner, Philip L. Fraietta, shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from the STATE of New York, not the District in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 2, No. 3, of the Verified Petition. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 11/22 10:55 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Philip L. Fraietta and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. Gayan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7878894) by Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. (Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 11/22 10:53 AM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stefan Bogdanovich and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael J. Gayan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7878886) by Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. (Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/18 3:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mars Carbonell. SeatGeek, Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2024, answer due 1/14/2025. (Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
7 7 notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Fri 11/08 4:45 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Stefan Bogdanovich, Philip Fraietta to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER[LINK:www.pacer.gov] to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/22/2024. (no image attached) (ALZ)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 11/08 4:44 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SeatGeek, Inc. re1 Complaint. (ALZ)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 11/08 3:49 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mars Carbonell. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Proposed Summons to be issued Fri 11/08 3:47 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Mars Carbonell. (Gayan, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Fri 11/08 9:19 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Stefan Bogdanovich to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER[LINK:www.pacer.gov] to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/22/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Fri 11/08 9:17 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Philip L Fraietta to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER[LINK:www.pacer.gov] to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/22/2024. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
1 1 21 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/07 8:07 PM
COMPLAINT against SeatGeek, Inc. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7864664) by Mars Carbonell. ( CLASS ACTION ) Certificate of Interested Parties due by 11/17/2024. Proof of service due by 2/5/2025. (Gayan, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 11/08 4:43 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ALZ)
Related: [-]