Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 2:24-bk-09608
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Dec 10, 2024

Debtor
ALK ASPHALT LLC
12630 N 103rd Ave Ste 133
Sun City, AZ 85351-3463
Represented By
THOMAS H. ALLEN
Allen, Jones & Giles, PLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
ZCHAPTER 11 FMC
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 230 NORTH FIRST AVENUE SUITE 204
PHOENIX, AZ 85003


Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
204 204 notice Notice of Filing Mon 05/19 4:04 PM
Notice of Filing Financial Reports Through May 9, 2025 filed by DAVID B. NELSON of Allen, Jones & Giles, PLC on behalf of ALK ASPHALT LLC.(NELSON, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
203 203 other Certificate of Service Tue 05/13 11:27 AM
Certificate of Service filed by DAVID B. NELSON of Allen, Jones & Giles, PLC on behalf of ALK ASPHALT LLC. Related [+] (NELSON, DAVID)
Related: [-] 202 Notice of Bar Date
Monday, May 12, 2025
202 202 notice Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of) Mon 05/12 3:54 PM
Notice of Bar Date Re Stipulated Motion to Assume Fuel Card Contract filed by DAVID B. NELSON of Allen, Jones & Giles, PLC on behalf of ALK ASPHALT LLC Related [+].(NELSON, DAVID)
Related: [-] 201 Motion to Assume
201 201 motion Assume (Motion to) Mon 05/12 3:46 PM
Stipulated Motion to Assume Fuel Card Contract filed by DAVID B. NELSON of Allen, Jones & Giles, PLC on behalf of ALK ASPHALT LLC. (NELSON, DAVID)
Related: [-]