Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah D Morrison
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:24-cv-04143
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Terminated:Jan 22, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Bryant & Straton College Inc.
Represented By
Keith Dye
Watstein Terepka LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brady Alan Misner
Represented By
Anthony Paronich
Paronich Law, P.C.
contact info
Brian T Giles
Giles & Harper, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/22 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Brady Alan Misner (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 01/28 11:30 AM
***Civil Case Terminated (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/17 10:28 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint Bryant & Straton College Inc. answer due 2/4/2025. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/17/2025. (agm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 01/16 6:31 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint New date requested 2/4/2025. by Defendant Bryant & Straton College Inc.. (Dye, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, December 30, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/30 11:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Bryant & Straton College Inc. answer due 1/21/2025 (kk2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation Thu 12/26 11:35 AM
STIPULATION (Joint) To Extend The Time For Defendant Bryant & Stratton College, Inc. To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Bryant & Straton College Inc.. (Dye, Keith)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/26 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Dye for Defendant Bryant & Straton College Inc. (Dye, Keith)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/16 10:46 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Bryant & Straton College Inc.. Bryant & Straton College Inc. served on 12/10/2024, answer due 12/31/2024. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
4 4 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/12 10:48 AM
NOTATION ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony Paronich as co-counsel. Co-counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/12/2024. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 11/08 2:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Bryant & Straton College Inc. (mas)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appear - Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/08 1:43 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-10243887) of Anthony Paronich by Plaintiff Brady Alan Misner. (Giles, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/08 11:34 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bryant & Straton College Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-10243628), filed by Brady Alan Misner. (Giles, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Form,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet