California Central District Court
Judge:Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr
Referred: A Joel Richlin
Case #: 2:24-cv-09671
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:29 AM PDT
Defendant
Andrew Enterprises, LLC
Defendant
Ash Hope II Inc.
Represented By
Matt D Valenti
Valenti Law Apc
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
Shonna Counter
Represented By
Matt D Valenti
Valenti Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Thursday, January 23, 2025
22 22 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 01/23 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
21 21 order Dismissing Case Fri 01/10 3:05 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a Notice of Settlement on 1/9/202520 . This action is therefore dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. For 60 days from the date of this order, the Court retains jurisdiction to vacate this order and to reopen the action nunc pro tunc on motion of any party. By operation of this order and without further court action, the dismissal in this case will convert to a dismissal with prejudice on the 61st day, absent a timely motion to vacate and reopen. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) ( Case Terminated. Made JS-6. ) (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
20 20 notice Settlement Thu 01/09 7:14 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
19 19 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Fri 01/03 3:27 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER re Default by Clerk by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The clerk has entered a default on January 3, 2025. Dkt. Nos.17 and18 . A motion for default judgment shall be filed by January 10, 2025. Failure to timely file the motion - or, in the alternative, a status report explaining why the motion should not now be filed - may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lfa)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 01/03 2:00 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Ash Hop II Inc. (gk)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 01/03 1:45 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Andrew Enterprises LLC. (gk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 01/02 8:18 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Ash Hope II Inc. filed by Plaintiff Ash Hope II Inc.. (Attorney Matt D Valenti added to party Ash Hope II Inc.(pty:dft)) (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Proof of Service
15 15 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 01/02 6:06 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Andrew Enterprises, LLC filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Proof of Service
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 12/19 2:39 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Defendants failed to timely respond, and Plaintiff has not sought entry of default against Defendants. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than 1/2/2025, why her claims should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. No oral argument on this matter will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 12/16 5:57 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter, upon Defendant Andrew Enterprises, LLC served on 11/21/2024, answer due 12/12/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kamran Gharibian, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 11/20 6:40 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter, upon Defendant Ash Hope II Inc. served on 11/13/2024, answer due 12/4/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Farshad Dan Ashoori, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Response Wed 11/20 6:36 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counterto Order to Show Cause,10 (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Declaration of Counsel
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 11/13 10:37 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. If Plaintiff fails to file a response within 14 days after entry of this Order, the Court will decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over her Unruh Act claim, and the Unruh Act claim will be automatically dismissed without prejudice without further order of the Court. (rolm)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 11/13 12:23 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Andrew Enterprises, LLC, and Ash Hope II Inc. (jtil)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 11/13 9:48 AM
Standing Order upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (lfa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 11/12 4:55 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 11/12 4:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 11/12 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge A. Joel Richlin. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 11/08 12:31 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/08 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter, (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 11/08 12:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 11/08 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38552048 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Matt D Valenti added to party Shonna Counter(pty:pla))(Valenti, Matt)
Related: [-]