New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:24-cv-10396
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 4:30 AM EST
Defendant
BELMAR POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
DENNIS LAVENDER
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE PROBATION DIVISION
Represented By
NATALIE DENNIS
contact info
Defendant
PATRICIA WHITE
Represented By
ALAN J. BARATZ
Weiner Law Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE
2102 N JOHN RUSSELL CIRCLE APT. B
ELKINS PARK, PA 19027


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
48 48 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 03/28 1:08 PM
LETTER ORDER granting27 MOTION for leave to file an Amended Complaint; finding as moot3 ,20 ,30 &31 SECOND AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief Due to Amended Complaint; and granting15 Motion to Dismiss. All claims against Dennis Lavendar for monetary damages are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All claims against the Belmar Police Department for money damages are also DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Court hereby ABSTAINS from addressing Plaintiff's remaining claims and STAYS the matter pending the outcome of Plaintiff's criminal prosecution. The Clerk's Office is instructed to mark this matter CLOSED. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/28/2025. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
47 47 respoth Response (NOT Motion) Tue 03/18 12:01 PM
REPLY for Urgent Decision to Grant Preliminary Injunction by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ADS) (dmr3)
Related: [-]
46 46 misc Letter Tue 03/18 10:25 AM
Letter from Alan J. Baratz, Esq.. (BARATZ, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 16, 2025
45 45 misc Letter Mon 03/17 10:08 AM
Letter Request for Urgent Decision on31 Preliminary Injunction from MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ADS) (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
44 44 misc Letter Tue 03/11 3:25 PM
Letter to Judge Zahid Quraishi requesting an urgent decision on preliminary injunction from MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
43 43 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 02/10 9:30 AM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE re31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Related [+](kht)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, February 06, 2025
42 42 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Fri 02/07 9:59 AM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE re27 MOTION to Amend. (Filed via ADS)(amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
41 41 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/04 9:16 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE PROBATION DIVISION re31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (DENNIS, NATALIE)
Related: [-]
40 40 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/04 9:00 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE PROBATION DIVISION re27 MOTION to Amend/Correct (DENNIS, NATALIE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/24 10:31 AM
LETTER ORDER that the request to adjourn the motions is hereby GRANTED. As to Defendant's question regarding the Probation Division's status as a party in light of the proposed Amended Complaint, the Division remains a party until either dismissed or dropped from an operative complaint. The proposed Amended Complaint is not yet operative, particularly given that there is an opposition to the Motion to Amend. The Division and Plaintiff should confer as to an appropriate stipulation of dismissal to clarify the docket. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 1/24/2025. (mlh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/24 10:35 AM
Reset Deadlines as to27 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Motion set for 2/18/2025 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/24 10:36 AM
Reset Deadlines as to31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 2/18/2025 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
38 38 misc Letter Tue 01/21 10:40 AM
Letter from Defendant Superior Court of New Jersey, Monmouth Vicinage, Probation Division Requesting Plaintiffs' Motions be Adjourned One Motion Cycle. (DENNIS, NATALIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
37 37 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 01/15 2:21 PM
Application to36 Reply Brief by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ADS) (amv)
Related: [-]
36 36 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 01/15 11:21 AM
REPLY BRIEF to Response to Motion filed by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE re15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . (Filed via ADS)(amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
35 35 respm Response in Support of Motion Tue 01/14 3:27 PM
RESPONSE in Support filed by DENNIS LAVENDER, PATRICIA WHITE, BELMAR POLICE DEPARTMENT re15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ,31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction,27 MOTION to Amend/Correct (BARATZ, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
31 31 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 01/06 10:06 AM
SECOND AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief Due to Amended Complaint by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. Related [+](mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/06 10:36 AM
Set Deadlines as to31 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 05, 2025
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 01/06 2:02 PM
REPLY BRIEF filed by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE re19 MOTION to Dismiss . (Filed via ADS)(amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
33 33 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 01/06 10:34 AM
AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF: MEMORANDUM in Support of Denying ALAN J. BARATZ, ESQ.'S15 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint against Defendants DENNIS LAVENDER, PATRICIA WHITE, and BELMAR POLICE DEPARTMENT by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. Related [+](mlh) Modified to correct file date on 1/6/2025 (jjc, )
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
32 32 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 01/06 10:21 AM
PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF: MEMORANDUM in Support of Denying ALAN J. BARATZ, ESQ.'S15 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint against Defendants DENNIS LAVENDER, PATRICIA WHITE, and BELMAR POLICE DEPARTMENT by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. Related [+](mlh) Modified to correct the file date on 1/6/2025 (jjc, )
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
30 30 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 01/06 9:48 AM
AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief Due to Amended Complaint by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. Related [+](mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, January 03, 2025
29 29 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 01/03 4:35 PM
Proposed Amended Complaint and Exhibits to27 Motion to Amend by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ADS) (amv)
Related: [-]
28 28 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/03 12:52 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition filed by DENNIS LAVENDER, PATRICIA WHITE, BELMAR POLICE DEPARTMENT, MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE PROBATION DIVISION re20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (BARATZ, ALAN)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Amend/Correct Fri 01/03 11:08 AM
MOTION for leave to file an Amended Complaint by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ADS)(jal, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Certification,
Att: 4 proposed order,
Att: 5 Complaint
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/03 11:09 AM
Set Deadlines as to27 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 01, 2025
26 26 misc Application/Petition Thu 01/02 11:01 AM
APPLICATION to file an amended complaint for by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ADS) (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order Tue 12/31 3:41 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff Michael Cirrincione's time to oppose is extended to 1/7/2025. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 12/31/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
24 24 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 12/31 2:57 PM
SECOND PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. Related [+](mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Att: 1 Indications of Differences,
Att: 2 Plaintiff's Certification of Evidence Establishing Defendants' Violations Under 42 U.S.C. § 1983 in Support of Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(b),
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
23 23 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Tue 12/31 12:25 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE re15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Related [+](kht)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
misc QC - Generic Message Tue 12/31 12:34 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the23 Letter Rule 7.1 can not be granted as it is filed out of time. This request has been forwarded to chambers. (kht)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 12/31 3:42 PM
Reset Deadlines as to15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 1/21/2025 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
22 22 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Mon 12/30 4:52 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ADS) (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/30 10:17 AM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 12/30 11:28 AM
Set Deadlines as to19 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 1/21/2025 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Mon 12/30 4:54 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document22 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE has been DENIED. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 29, 2024
21 21 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/30 10:47 AM
PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. Related [+](mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 Amended Certification
20 20 motion Preliminary Injunction Mon 12/30 10:15 AM
AMENDED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Declaratory Relief by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Certification,
Att: 3 Affidavit,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 27, 2024
19 19 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Fri 12/27 5:14 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE PROBATION DIVISION. Responses due by 1/7/2025.(DENNIS, NATALIE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certification
Friday, December 13, 2024
18 18 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Fri 12/13 10:16 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to DEFENDANT SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MONMOUTH VICINAGE, PROBATION DIVISION.. (DENNIS, NATALIE)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 12/13 1:57 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE PROBATION DIVISION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/27/2024. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
17 17 misc Certification Fri 12/13 9:59 AM
Certification of Evidence in Support of1 Complaint, on behalf of MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(amv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/12 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE DENNIS on behalf of MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE PROBATION DIVISION (DENNIS, NATALIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss Wed 12/11 10:50 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by DENNIS LAVENDER, PATRICIA WHITE, BELMAR POLICE DEPARTMENT. Responses due by 12/23/2024.(BARATZ, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Brief,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 12/11 11:06 AM
Set Deadlines as to15 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . Motion set for 1/6/2025 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Wed 11/27 10:07 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BELMAR POLICE DEPARTMENT, PATRICIA WHITE, DENNIS LAVENDER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/13/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff Wed 11/27 2:44 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the13 "PROOF OF SERVICE" filed by the Clerk's Office on 11/26/2024 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
14 14 respoth Response (NOT Motion) Wed 11/27 2:47 PM
REPLY to Opposition Letter from Alan J. Baratz, Esq. by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. Related [+](mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 Proof of Service,
Att: 2 Proof of Service
13 13 service Certificate of Service Wed 11/27 1:33 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE of Reply to Opposition Letter From Alan J. Baratz, Esq. by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. Related [+](mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit
12 12 misc Letter Tue 11/26 2:35 PM
Letter from Alan J. Baratz, Esq.. (BARATZ, ALAN)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Tue 11/26 2:33 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney ALAN J. BARATZ for BELMAR POLICE DEPARTMENT,ALAN J. BARATZ for DENNIS LAVENDER,ALAN J. BARATZ for PATRICIA WHITE added. (BARATZ, ALAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
10 10 service Certificate of Service Fri 11/22 4:39 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE Related [+](kht)
Related: [-] ceived via Help Desk
Att: 1 Summons as to Monmouth County
Thursday, November 21, 2024
9 9 service Certificate of Service Thu 11/21 4:46 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. Related [+](mlh)
Related: [-] ceived via ECF Help Desk
Att: 1 Summons
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
8 8 service Certificate of Service Wed 11/20 4:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk)(jal, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, November 15, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Fri 11/15 1:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Exhibit (to Document) Fri 11/15 1:52 PM
Letter Brief to3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and TRO, by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (amv)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 11/08 3:40 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BELMAR POLICE DEPARTMENT, DENNIS LAVENDER, MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE PROBATION DIVISION, and PATRICIA WHITE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Fri 11/08 3:39 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se. (mlh)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order Fri 11/08 3:37 PM
MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE.(mlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Affidavit
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/08 3:27 PM
CONSENT & REGISTRATION Form to Receive Documents Electronically by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE. (mlh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/08 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against BELMAR POLICE DEPARTMENT, DENNIS LAVENDER, MONMOUTH COUNTY VICINAGE PROBATION DIVISION, PATRICIA WHITE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number TRE141185) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHAEL CIRRINCIONE.(mlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibits,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Envelope
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 11/08 3:38 PM
Set Deadlines as to3 Motion for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Motion set for 12/2/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mlh)
Related: [-]