Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Kyle C Dudek
Referred: Kyle C Dudek
Case #: 2:24-cv-01035
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:1938 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Cornerstone Builders of SW Florida Inc.
Represented By
Kelly Tackett
contact info
Scott Edward Atwood
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Karvis
Represented By
Kelly Tackett
contact info
Scott Edward Atwood
Henderson, Franklin, Starnes & Holt, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeremy Rosello
Represented By
Ilona Demenina Anderson
Carpe Diem Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
36 36 order Order Fri 05/09 9:57 AM
ENDORSED ORDER. The parties must file a notice to tell the Court, by 5/23/25, if this case has settled. If the case has settled, the parties must either file a stipulation for dismissal under Rule 41 or otherwise move the Court to approve their settlement. See King v. Sch. Bd. of Charlotte Cnty., Fla., No. 2:22-CV-277-KCD, 2022 WL 4110289, at *1 (M.D. Fla. Sept. 8, 2022). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 5/9/2025. (BLW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
35 35 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 3:55 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:24-cv-1035-KCD. Judge Sheri Polster Chappell no longer assigned to the case. (LF)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Order on Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge Tue 05/06 9:09 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting the parties' joint consent to proceed with United States Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. (Doc. 33 ). This action is referred to Judge Dudek to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign this action to Judge Dudek. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/6/2025. (JMM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
33 33 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 05/05 9:07 AM
PROPOSED CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Cornerstone Builders of SW Florida Inc., Matthew Karvis. (Tackett, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/10 5:47 PM
NOTICE by Jeremy Rosello re31 Notice of consent to join Notice of Filing (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Notice of consent to join Thu 04/10 5:44 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Jeremy Rosello by Jason Sfara . (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/10 5:14 PM
NOTICE by Jeremy Rosello re29 Notice of consent to join Notice of Filing (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of consent to join Thu 04/10 5:07 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Jeremy Rosello by Andrew Pfeifer . (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/10 4:38 PM
NOTICE by Jeremy Rosello re27 Notice of consent to join Notice of Filing (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of consent to join Thu 04/10 4:34 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Jeremy Rosello by Kenneth Jackson . (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/10 4:31 PM
NOTICE by Jeremy Rosello re25 Notice of consent to join Notice of Filing (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of consent to join Thu 04/10 4:20 PM
NOTICE of consent to join by Jeremy Rosello by Bradley Wegert . (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
24 24 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Tue 03/11 9:52 AM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:18 Case Management Scheduling Order by Jeremy Rosello. (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 answer Answer to amended complaint Tue 02/18 3:08 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 22 Amended Complaint by Cornerstone Builders of SW Florida Inc., Matthew Karvis.(Tackett, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/03 4:58 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Jeremy Rosello. Related document: 1 Complaintfiled by Jeremy Rosello.(Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 01/17 11:17 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 20 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants must respond to the complaint by 2/3/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 1/17/2025. (BLW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Thu 01/16 3:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 19 Order, by Cornerstone Builders of SW Florida Inc., Matthew Karvis. (Atwood, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
19 19 order Order Fri 01/10 3:38 PM
ENDORSED ORDER. The Court denied the motion to dismiss without prejudice (Doc. 10), but Defendants have since not responded to the complaint. Defendants' response to the complaint is due by 1/17/25. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 1/10/2025. (BLW)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Case Management Scheduling Order Fri 01/10 10:23 AM
FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for deadlines and requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 1/10/2025. (CGW)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Hearing - Cancel Fri 01/10 10:21 AM
NOTICE canceling Rule 16(b) hearing scheduled for 2/27/25. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
16 16 notice Compliance notice Wed 01/08 9:32 AM
NOTICE of compliance re15 Notice of Lead Counsel Designation by Jeremy Rosello (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 01/08 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Ilona Demenina Anderson on behalf of Jeremy Rosello. Lead Counsel: Ilona D. Anderson. (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
14 14 notice Compliance notice Tue 01/07 1:58 PM
NOTICE of compliance re 11 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule,, by Cornerstone Builders of SW Florida Inc., Matthew Karvis (Atwood, Scott)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 01/07 1:52 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Scott Edward Atwood on behalf of Cornerstone Builders of SW Florida Inc., Matthew Karvis. Lead Counsel: Scott E. Atwood. (Atwood, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 01/06 12:33 PM
NOTICE of hearing: Rule 16(b) Conference set for 2/27/2025 at 10:15 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. Case Management Report due by 2/12/2025. Zoom instructions will be set via separate instructions to counsel of record. (CGW)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 01/06 9:52 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ilona Anderson, Kelly Tackett, and Scott Atwood of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion to Dismiss / Failure to State a Claim Mon 01/06 9:35 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 8 ) for failure to include a compliant Local Rule 3.01(g) Certification. The Court cannot overstate the importance of Local Rule 3.01(g) in helping avoid needless litigation, fostering communication between the parties, and helping to resolve disputes without court intervention. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/6/2025. (JMM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of appearance Fri 01/03 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Tackett on behalf of Cornerstone Builders of SW Florida Inc., Matthew Karvis (Tackett, Kelly)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/03 4:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Atwood, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
7 7 service Summons returned executed Mon 12/02 4:42 PM
RETURN of service executed on 11/25/2024 by Jeremy Rosello as to Matthew Karvis. (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons returned executed Mon 12/02 4:40 PM
RETURN of service executed on 11/19/2024 by Jeremy Rosello as to Cornerstone Builders of SW Florida Inc.. (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement - LR 3.03 and FRCP 7.1 Wed 11/20 4:05 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Jeremy Rosello. (Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
4 4 order Civil Action Order Wed 11/13 9:28 AM
CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/13/2024. (CGW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
3 3 service Summons issued Tue 11/12 4:37 PM
SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (EVK)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/12 9:34 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. New case number: 2:24-cv-1035-SPC-KCD. (AA)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/08 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22705150) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Anderson, Ilona)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons