Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Bodenhausen
Case #: 4:24-cv-01500
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 3:25 AM CST
Defendant
BJC Health System
Represented By
Madeline J. Nebel
Ogletree Deakins Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Patrick F. Hulla
Ogletree Deakins Pc - Kansas City
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul J. Luebbers
Represented By
Erika Victoria Dopuch
The Defeo Law Firm - Kansas City
contact info
Daniel T. DeFeo
The Defeo Law Firm - Kansas City
contact info

GPO Feb 21 2025
More Definite Statement as to Count II (Doc. 12) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a more definite statement as to Count II by March 7, 2025. This matter is hereby SET for a hearing to discuss jurisdictional discovery on Thursday March 6, 2025 aMEMORANDUM AND ORDER...For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 15) is DENIED without prejudice, Plaintiff's alternative Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery (Doc. 15) is GRANTED, and Defendant's Motion for a t 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15S of the Thomas F. Eagleton U.S. Courthouse. ( Discovery Hearing set for 3/6/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 15S - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen.). Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 2/21/2025. (NEP)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
33 33 order A Docket Text Order Tue 04/29 3:21 PM
Docket Text ORDER: The discovery dispute conference set for May 1, 2025 is hereby CANCELLED. Defendant represents that the parties have not fully conferred as to its objections to the requests to produce. The parties are directed to convene a meaningful and good faith meet-and-confer to discuss all of Defendant's objections to the requests to produce (and not merely the time period). If the parties are still unable to resolve their disputes, they may request another discovery dispute conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 4/29/25. (SGP)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
32 32 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Mon 04/28 12:05 PM
Docket Text ORDER: This matter is hereby SET for a Discovery Dispute Conference on Plaintiff's requests to produce on 5/1/2025 at 10:30 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Counsel will receive a separate email with a link to join the conference by Zoom. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.02, all means of photographing, recording, broadcasting, and televising are prohibited in any courtroom, and in areas adjacent to any courtroom, except when authorized by the presiding judge. This includes proceedings ordered by the Court to be conducted by phone or video. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 4/28/25. (SGP)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 04/18 9:17 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 Second MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant BJC Health System. (Hulla, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
30 30 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/11 8:57 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re28 Second MOTION for More Definite Statement and SIS filed by Plaintiff Paul J. Luebbers. (Dopuch, Erika)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
29 29 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 04/01 3:08 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re28 Second MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion More Definite Statement Tue 04/01 3:07 PM
Second MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
27 27 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 03/24 3:35 PM
STIPULATED LIMITED PROTECTIVE ORDER [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 03/24/2025. (LCR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
26 26 misc Stipulation Thu 03/13 5:05 PM
STIPULATION re25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Limited) by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Protective Order Thu 03/13 5:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
24 24 4 pgs misc Memorandum (NON-MOTION EVENT) Fri 03/07 9:14 AM
MEMORANDUM re21 Memorandum & Order,,, Plaintiffs' More Definite Statement by Plaintiff Paul J. Luebbers. (Dopuch, Erika)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Thu 03/06 3:16 PM
ORDER - On March 6, 2025, a hearing was held in which the parties appeared counsel. At the hearing, the Court discussed the nature and extent of jurisdictional discovery as directed by this Court's February 21, 2025 Memorandum and Order (Doc.21 ). Pursuant to that Order and the hearing, the following is hereby ORDERED: [SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS] Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 3/6/2025. (KEK)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Status Conference Thu 03/06 1:24 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen: Discovery Hearing held on 3/6/2025. Parties present to discuss jurisdictional discovery. Status report to be filed by Plaintiff. Order to issue setting further deadlines. (proceedings started: 1:04 p.m.) (proceedings ended: 1:21 p.m.) (FTR Gold Operator Initials: KEK)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Erika Dopuch)(Appearance for Defendant: Patrick Hulla and Madeline Nebel) (KEK)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
21 21 7 pgs order Memorandum & Order Fri 02/21 3:37 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc.15 ) is DENIED without prejudice, Plaintiff's alternative Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery (Doc.15 ) is GRANTED, and Defendant's Motion for a More Definite Statement as to Count II (Doc.12 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file a more definite statement as to Count II by March 7, 2025. This matter is hereby SET for a hearing to discuss jurisdictional discovery on Thursday March 6, 2025 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15S of the Thomas F. Eagleton U.S. Courthouse. ( Discovery Hearing set for 3/6/2025 01:00 PM in Courtroom 15S - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen.). Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 2/21/2025. (NEP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
20 20 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 01/14 3:33 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Paul J. Luebbers. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Dopuch, Erika)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement - Initial Notice Tue 01/14 12:18 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Paul J. Luebbers . Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental party, including individuals, or intervenors must file a Disclosure Statement in any case based on Diversity Jurisdiction immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Individuals must complete Section 2 of the form, listing the party's name and state of citizenship , (Not Residence or Domicile). Parties must use the Court adopted form.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] .(CBL)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/30 12:45 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count II filed by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
17 17 5 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 12/20 2:55 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count II filed by Plaintiff Paul J. Luebbers. (Dopuch, Erika)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 12/20 1:25 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for City of St. Louis filed by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
15 15 motion Remand to State Court Fri 12/06 4:12 PM
First MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court for City of St. Louis by Plaintiff Paul J. Luebbers. (Dopuch, Erika)
Related: [-]
14 14 19 pgs respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal Case ONLY) Fri 12/06 2:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)1 Notice of Removal Petition, filed by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
13 13 6 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 12/06 2:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re12 MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count II filed by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion More Definite Statement Fri 12/06 2:11 PM
MOTION for More Definite Statement as to Count II by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
11 11 misc Full Consent to a Magistrate Mon 12/02 3:08 PM
FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Paul J. Luebbers, Defendant BJC Health System. (LCR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 11/19 10:56 AM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BJC Health System. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/19 10:21 AM
Docket Text Order: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc.7 ) is GRANTED; answer due by December 6, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 11/19/24. (SGP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 11/18 10:28 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BJC Health System. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 11/14 12:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Notice of Removal Petition, by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
6 6 misc Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08 Tue 11/12 6:26 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY Tue 11/12 10:49 AM
Petition Related [+] Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Paul J. Luebbers.(JWD)
Related: [-] moval/Transfer
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Notice of Removal Tue 11/12 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant BJC Health System Sent To: State Court - Executed and Plaintiff (Nebel, Madeline) Modified on 11/12/2024 (JWD)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Tue 11/12 9:59 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Notice of Removal Petition, (State Court Docket) by Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Entry of Appearance Tue 11/12 9:50 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Madeline J. Nebel for Defendant BJC Health System. (Nebel, Madeline)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Notification Tue 11/12 10:58 AM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Petition Fri 11/08 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, MO, case number 2422-CC11205, with receipt number AMOEDC-10927822, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by BJC Health System.(Hulla, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Class Action Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Sefton Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Buss Declaration,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Original Filing Form