New Jersey District Court
Judge:Karen M Williams
Referred: Elizabeth A Pascal
Case #: 1:24-cv-10406
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Re-opened:May 15, 2025
Terminated:May 15, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
XYZ PARTNERSHIP 101-200
Defendant
XYZ PARTNERSHIP 1-100
Defendant
JOHN/JANE DOE 101-200
Defendant
JANE/JOHN DOE 1-100
Defendant
ABC CORPORATION 101-200
Defendant
ABC CORPORATION 1-100
Defendant
JOHN/JANE ROE RESORT OWNER 1-20
Defendant
JOHN/JANE ROE FRANCHISEE 1-20
Defendant
FAIRMONT MAYAKOBA RESORT
Represented By
MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ACCOR MANAGEMENT US, INC.
Registered Agent C T Corporation 820 Bear Tavern Road
West Trenton, NJ 08628
Represented By
JONATHAN STUCKEL
Gordon & Rees
contact info
MELISSA JENNIFER BROWN
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LINDA MARINO
Represented By
CRAIG J. HUBERT
Szaferman, Lakind, Blumstein, Blader & Lehmann, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
THOMAS MARINO
Represented By
CRAIG J. HUBERT
Szaferman, Lakind, Blumstein, Blader & Lehmann, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
ACCOR MANAGEMENT CANADA, INC.
Terminated: 01/10/2025
Defendant
FAIRMONT MIRAMAR HOTELS & BUNGALOWS
Terminated: 01/10/2025
101 Wilshire Blvd.
Santa Monica, CA 90401
Defendant
ACCOR SERVICES US, LLC
Terminated: 01/10/2025
Registered Agent The Corporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
ACCOR FRANCHISING US, LLC
Terminated: 01/10/2025
Registered Agent Corporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 05/15 4:15 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice, and without costs. Signed by Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/15/25. (nar)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order 60-Day Administrative Termination Mon 03/03 11:55 AM
Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement.( Administrative Termination deadline set for 5/2/2025). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 2/28/2025. (kes, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Fri 02/28 1:16 PM
Letter from Plaintiffs re12 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (HUBERT, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
16 16 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/11 3:37 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by FAIRMONT MAYAKOBA RESORT, ACCOR MANAGEMENT US, INC. re14 Cross MOTION to Transfer Case to Maryland ,12 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (STUCKEL, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
15 15 misc Letter Thu 01/23 3:38 PM
Letter re14 Cross MOTION to Transfer Case to Maryland ,13 Brief in Opposition to Motion,12 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . (HUBERT, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 motion Transfer Case Tue 01/21 5:00 PM
Cross MOTION to Transfer Case to Maryland by LINDA MARINO, THOMAS MARINO.(HUBERT, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit A
13 13 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Tue 01/21 4:51 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by LINDA MARINO, THOMAS MARINO re12 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (HUBERT, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/23 10:19 AM
Set Deadlines as to14 Cross MOTION to Transfer Case to Maryland . Motion set for 2/18/2025 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 motion Dismiss Fri 01/10 4:48 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by FAIRMONT MAYAKOBA RESORT, ACCOR MANAGEMENT US, INC..(BROWN, MELISSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief,
Att: 2 Certification Certification of Attorney,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B
11 11 order Stipulation and Order Fri 01/10 3:32 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT: the deadline for Defendants to answer the Complaint is extended up to and including 1/11/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 1/10/2025. (mag)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/13 11:00 AM
Set Deadlines as to12 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Motion set for 2/3/2025 before Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 01/09 2:27 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION FOR TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by ACCOR MANAGEMENT US, INC.. (STUCKEL, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Wed 01/08 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Accor Management Canada, Inc., Accor Franchising US, LLC, Accor Services US, LLC and Fairmont Miramar Hotels & Bungalows without prejudice by LINDA MARINO, THOMAS MARINO (HUBERT, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
8 8 order Order Tue 12/31 2:08 PM
TEXT ORDER - Within five (5) days of this order, Defendants must submit a Diversity Disclosure Statement as provided by the Clerk`s Quality Control Message issued on 11/12/2024. The Court notes that the Diversity Disclosure Statement provides additional space for Defendants to provide the specific information required to assert a corporation and/or LLC`s citizenship (further noting footnote 3, whereby a corporation must explicitly assert its state of incorporation and principal place of business to properly assert its citizenship; and further noting footnote 5, whereby an LLC must explicitly assert the citizenship of each of its members). So Ordered by Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/31/2024 (dad)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
7 7 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 12/16 2:46 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by LINDA MARINO, THOMAS MARINO. (HUBERT, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
6 6 order Stipulation and Order Fri 12/13 4:12 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE COMPLAINT: The time in which Defendants may respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including 1/11/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 12/13/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Fri 12/13 2:57 PM
TEXT ORDER Within five (5) days of this order, Plaintiffs must submit a Diversity Disclosure Statement as provided by the Clerk's Quality Control Message issued on 11/12/2024. So Ordered by Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/13/24. (nar)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Stipulation Fri 12/13 2:47 PM
STIPULATION for Extension ot Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint by FAIRMONT MAYAKOBA RESORT, ACCOR MANAGEMENT CANADA, INC., ACCOR FRANCHISING US, LLC, ACCOR MANAGEMENT US, INC., ACCOR SERVICES US, LLC, FAIRMONT MIRAMAR HOTELS & BUNGALOWS. (STUCKEL, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 11/12 2:06 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to ACCOR FRANCHISING US, LLC, ACCOR MANAGEMENT CANADA, INC., ACCOR MANAGEMENT US, INC., ACCOR SERVICES US, LLC, FAIRMONT MAYAKOBA RESORT, FAIRMONT MIRAMAR HOTELS & BUNGALOWS. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Tue 11/12 10:23 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint with the Civil Cover Sheet2 filed by Craig Hubert on 11/8/2024 was submitted incorrectly as an Amended Complaint. Please be advised for future filings to use the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents to file a civil cover sheet when not included in the initial filing. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (tf, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 11/12 2:05 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information: All parties on the complaint must be entered into the CMECF, and party addresses should not be displayed on the docket . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (aji, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Tue 11/12 2:07 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 2:07 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
2 2 16 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 11/08 5:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT to include civil cover sheet against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by THOMAS MARINO, LINDA MARINO.(HUBERT, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/08 5:19 PM
COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATION 1-200, ACCOR FRANCHISING US, LLC, ACCOR MANAGEMENT CANADA, INC., ACCOR MANAGEMENT US, INC., ACCOR SERVICES US, LLC, FAIRMONT MAYAKOBA RESORT, FAIRMONT MIRAMAR HOTELS & BUNGALOWS, JOHN/JANE DOE 1-200, JOHN/JANE ROE FRANCHISEE 1-20, JOHN/JANE ROE RESORT OWNER 1-20, XYZ PARTNERSHIP 1-200 ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15797510) with JURY DEMAND, filed by THOMAS MARINO, LINDA MARINO.(HUBERT, CRAIG)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 11/12 10:18 AM
Judge Karen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (tf, )
Related: [-]