Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Michael P Mills
Referred: Roy Percy
Case #: 3:24-cv-00346
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1402 U.S. as a Defendant (formerly Medical Malpractice)
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 3:56 AM CDT
Defendant
The United States of America
Represented By
Stuart Davis
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
David Ford Berry, IV
Deaton & Berry, P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Judith Ellis
Terminated: 02/13/2025


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/16 4:11 PM
ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice re:12 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 4/16/2025. (spw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 02/27 3:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice . (Berry, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/13 9:02 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE due to settlement. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 2/13/2025. (spw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 11:41 AM
ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY DEFENDANT AND AMENDING CAPTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/12/25. (bnd)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Wed 02/12 9:40 AM
NOTICE by Stuart Davis on behalf of The United States of America Substitution of the United States of America as the Sole Defendant (Davis, Stuart)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 02/12 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart Davis on behalf of The United States of America (Davis, Stuart)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/30 2:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Ford Berry, IV on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company on The United States of America served on 12/18/2024 (Berry, David) Modified on 1/30/2025 (zdg)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/30 2:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Ford Berry, IV on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company on Judith Ellis served on 1/13/2025. (Berry, David) Modified on 1/30/2025 (zdg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
notice Notice of Correction Wed 01/29 1:45 PM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE re5 Summons Returned Executed,4 Summons Returned Executed, : Attorney directed to refile returns to include copy of issued summons (zdg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/23 9:51 AM
DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY DIRECTED TO REFILE SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Ford Berry, IV on behalf of The United States of America The United States of America served on 12/18/2024. (Berry, David) Modified on 1/23/2025 (jla)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 01/23 9:42 AM
DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY DIRECTED TO REFILE SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Ford Berry, IV on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company Judith Ellis served on 12/18/2024. (Berry, David) Modified on 1/23/2025 (jla)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 01/23 10:37 AM
Reset Answer Deadlines: Judith Ellis answer due 2/16/2025; The United States of America answer due 2/16/2025. (jla)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Correction Thu 01/23 10:39 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE re5 Summons Returned Executed,4 Summons Returned Executed : Attorney directed to refile returns to include copy of issued summons (jla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
notice Notice of Correction Wed 01/22 5:21 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE : Summons Returns filed in wrong case; Attorney directed to file executed summons in proper case in order for answer deadline to be set. (jla)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Fri 01/17 2:20 PM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Judith Ellis and The United States of America (zdg)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Mon 12/16 1:43 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Judith Ellis, The United States of America (jla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Tue 11/12 9:08 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 11/12/2024. (zdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 11/08 3:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company and The United States of America. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (lgm)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/08 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMSNDC-2459526, filed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (lgm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Fri 11/08 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (lgm)
Related: [-]