California Central District Court
Judge:Sunshine Suzanne Sykes
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:24-cv-02388
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Case in other court:Zheng, Xiumei v. Costco Wholesale Corporation, CIVRS2400796
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
Eric David Ovitz
Mccune And Harber
contact info
Stephen M Harber
Mccune And Harber LLP
contact info
Amy Arseneaux Evenstad
Mccune And Harber LLP
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Richard T. Copeland
Represented By
Richard T Copeland
Conflict Solution Services
contact info
Plaintiff
Xiumei Zheng
Represented By
Todd B Becker
Becker Law Group
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 02/06/2025


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
22 22 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Fri 03/28 9:45 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard T. Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
21 21 adr Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2) Thu 03/27 1:07 PM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 8/14/2025 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Xiumei Zheng(Becker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 03/07 2:33 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric David Ovitz counsel for Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. Filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Ovitz, Eric)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 03/07 2:26 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Arseneaux Evenstad counsel for Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. Adding Amy A. Evenstad as counsel of record for Defendant, Costco Wholesale Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attorney Amy Arseneaux Evenstad added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft))(Evenstad, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
18 18 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Mon 02/10 10:16 AM
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ("OSC") by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: On January 15, 2025, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause Regarding Doe Defendants that directed Plaintiff to respond in writing by February 12, 2025. [Dkt. 14]. On February 6, 2025, Plaintiff filed its Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. [Dkt. 17]. In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, the Court hereby DISCHARGES the OSC. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Thu 02/06 12:25 PM
Notice OF DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a) or (c) filed by Plaintiff Xiumei Zheng. (Becker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
16 16 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Fri 01/17 4:26 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than (cbr)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Fri 01/17 4:25 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2025. Motions due by 12/5/2025. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/26/2025. Motion set for hearing on 2/13/2026 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2026 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Jury Trial set for 3/9/2026 09:00 AM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 01/15 12:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/12/2025. (twdb)
Related: [-]
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 01/15 10:03 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OFF CALENDAR by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on 1/17/2025 1:00 PM is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
12 12 misc Report Tue 12/31 10:37 AM
REPORT of Joint Rule 26(f) Report filed by Plaintiff Xiumei Zheng. (Becker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
11 11 attorney Change of Address Fri 12/13 5:51 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Todd B Becker attorney for Plaintiff Xiumei Zheng. Changing attorneys address to 388 Cordova St., Suite 100C, Pasadena, CA 91101. Filed by Plaintiff Xiumei Zheng. (Becker, Todd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 11/21 4:47 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
9 9 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 11/18 1:22 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2025 at 01:00 PM via Zoom videoconference before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes.) (twdb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 11/13 1:29 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 11/13 1:28 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 11/13 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/08 4:25 PM
Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE COPORATION. (Ovitz, Eric)
Related: [-]
4 4 trial Jury Demand Fri 11/08 4:19 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE COPORATION.. (Ovitz, Eric)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/08 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants COSTCO WHOLESALE COPORATION, identifying Interested Parties. (Ovitz, Eric)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 11/08 4:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE COPORATION. (Ovitz, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 11/08 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CIVRS2400796 Receipt No: ACACDC-38555162 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE COPORATION. (Attorney Eric David Ovitz added to party COSTCO WHOLESALE COPORATION(pty:dft))(Ovitz, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Wed 11/13 1:15 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does., filed by Plaintiff Xiumei Zheng. [FILED IN STATE COURT 09/04/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Wed 11/13 1:17 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. [FILED IN STATE COURT 10/22/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh)
Related: [-]