Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-11828
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 09, 2024 1:06 AM MST
Defendant
Joyce Janitzy Castro-Patricio (1)
Represented By
Ricardo Bours
Law Office Of Ricardo Bours
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joseph G Rieu
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/09/2024 2:42 AM MST
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
Arrest of Joyce Janitzy Castro-Patricio on 11/5/2024. (SGG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Joyce Janitzy Castro-Patricio. (SGG)
Related: [-]