|
|
Arrest of Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez (smy) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Set/Reset Hearings as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia: Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Set/Reset Hearings as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez: Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Set/Reset Hearings as to Richard John Sydney-Smith: Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of David Martinez (smy) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (smy) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Set Hearing as to David Martinez: Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (smy) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 2 restricted/sealed until further notice. (smy) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Set Hearing as to Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez: Initial Appearance set for 10/29/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (smy) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia (1). (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez (1). (rbe) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Richard John Sydney-Smith (1). (rbe) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to David Martinez (1). (smy) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez (1). (smy) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Initial Appearance as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia held on 10/29/2024. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 10/29/2024. Arraignment set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 11/4/2024 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-FTL for Onasis Lisandro Garcia (Digital 12:21:23/12:46:59) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Initial Appearance as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez held on 10/29/2024. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 10/29/2024. Arraignment set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 11/1/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Spanish Interpreter present. Attorney added: Frank Schwartz for Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez for Criminal CJA representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 10/29/2024. (Digital 12:21:23/13:03:42) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Initial Appearance as to Richard John Sydney-Smith held on 10/29/2024. Date of Location Custody (Arrest or Surrender): 10/29/2024. Arraignment set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 11/1/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Attorney added: Arthur Louis Wallace, III for Richard John Sydney-Smith for Criminal CJA representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 10/29/2024. (Digital 12:21:23/12:47:40) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Initial Appearance as to David Martinez held on 10/29/2024.. Arraignment set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 11/1/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 11/1/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 12:21:23/13:18:34) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Initial Appearance as to Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez held on 10/29/2024.. Arraignment set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 11/1/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Spanish Interpreter present. Attorney added: Roy Jeffrey Kahn for Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez for Criminal CJA representation. Date attorney was appointed CJA: 10/29/2024. (Digital 12:21:23/13:22:03) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
DEFENDANT ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
DEFENDANT ORAL MOTION to Appoint CJA Counsel as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
DEFENDANT ORAL MOTION to Appoint CJA Counsel as to Richard John Sydney-Smith. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
ORAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez. (smy) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. See DE3 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 4 DEFENDANT ORAL MOTION to Appoint CJA Counsel as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. See DE3 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 4 DEFENDANT ORAL MOTION to Appoint CJA Counsel as to Richard John Sydney-Smith (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. See DE3 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Richard John Sydney-Smith. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez. (smy) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 6 ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. See DE3 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 6 ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. See DE3 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 6 ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention Hearing by USA as to Richard John Sydney-Smith (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. See DE3 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 6 Motion for Pretrial Detention Hearing. as to Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
DEFENSE ORAL MOTION to Continue PTD Hearing as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 8 DEFENSE ORAL MOTION to Continue PTD Hearing as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. See DE3 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
Order on Partial Indigency for Appointment of Counsel and Distribution of Available Funds as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia Directing Funds in the amount of $10,000 be deposited with the Clerk of Court by 11/26/2024 Status Conference Re: Partial Indigency/CJA Payment set for 11/26/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
Notice of Assignment of Assistant Federal Public Defender as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia. Attorney Huda Ajlani Macri added. Attorney Noticing FPD-FTL terminated.. Attorney Huda Ajlani Macri added to party Onasis Lisandro Garcia(pty:dft). (Ajlani Macri, Huda) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
Invocation of Right to Silence and Counsel by Onasis Lisandro Garcia (Ajlani Macri, Huda) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Detention hearing to Nov. 4 2024 by Richard John Sydney-Smith. Responses due by 11/13/2024.(Wallace, Arthur) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
1 pgs
Text of Proposed Order Unopposed to Nov. 4 2024
|
9
|
|
9
PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant Richard John Sydney-Smith's8 Unopposed Motion to Continue Detention Hearing as to Richard John Sydney-Smith (1). Detention Hearing reset for 11/4/2024 at 9:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 10/30/2024. (ar2) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
TRANSCRIPT of Initial Appearance Hearing as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia held on 10/29/2024 before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle, 1-25 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie Joy Lewis, 954-985-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/21/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2025. (apz) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Report Re: Counsel Hearing as to David Martinez held on 11/1/2024, Detention Hearing as to David Martinez not held on 11/1/2024., ( Detention Hearing reset for 11/4/2024 09:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge., Report Re: Counsel Hearing reset for 11/4/2024 09:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge.). (Digital 10:49:35) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/1/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
ORAL MOTION to Continue Hearing by David Martinez. (smy) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 5 Motion to Continue Hearing as to David Martinez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/1/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Detention Hearing as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez held on 11/1/2024. Witness Agent David Franklin testified. Court detains defendant, pending trial. Order to follow. Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 10:49:35) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/1/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Status RE Detention Hearing as to Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez held on 11/1/2024. Defense counsel had a scheduling conflict couldn't proceed with detention hearing., (Detention Hearing RESET for 11/6/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge.). Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 10:49:35) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/1/2024). (at) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
ORAL MOTION for Bond by Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez. (smy) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
ORAL MOTION to Continue Detention Hearing by Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez. (at) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
PAPERLESS ORDER denying 9 Motion for Bond. as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/1/2024. (smy) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion to Continue Detention Hearing as to Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez (1). Detention Hearing RESET for 11/6/2024 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/1/2024). (at) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
ORAL MOTION for PRETRIAL DETENTION by USA as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez. (smy) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eduardo Xavier Pereira appearing for Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez. Attorney Eduardo Xavier Pereira added to party Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez(pty:dft). (at) [0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
2
pgs
Joint MOTION to Reopen Pretrial Detention Hearing to Correct Record by USA as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez. Responses due by 11/15/2024.(Brown, Latoya) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Text of Proposed Order
|
13
|
|
13
PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING12 Motion as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez (1). The Pretrial Detention Hearing is hereby reopened. A hearing is set for 11/5/2024 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle, 299 East Broward Boulevard, Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33301. A courtroom designation will follow by separate Order prior to the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/1/2024. (sd01) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch: Report Re: Counsel Hearing as to David Martinez NOT held on 11/4/2024, Detention Hearing as to David Martinez NOT held on 11/4/2024. Arraignment set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 11/6/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 11/6/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 10:24:13) Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 11/4/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
DEFENDANT'S ORAL MOTION TO RESET REPORT RE:COUNSEL/ DETENTION HEARING (rbe) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
PAPERLESS ORDER granting 8 DEFENDANT'S ORAL MOTION TO RESET REPORT RE:COUNSEL/ DETENTION HEARING as to David Martinez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 11/4/2024. See DE7 for full details. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch: Detention Hearing as to Richard John Sydney-Smith held on 11/4/2024. Witness David Franklin testified. Bond recommendation/set: Richard John Sydney-Smith (1) Pretrial Detention. Order To Follow. Arraignment set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 9:12:01) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 11/4/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to Richard John Sydney-Smith. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06501-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch: Detention Hearing as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia held on 11/4/2024. Witness Agent David Franklin testified. Bond recommendation/set: Onasis Lisandro Garcia (1) Pretrial Detention. Order To Follow. Arraignment set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 9:12:01) Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 11/4/2024. (rbe) (Main Document 14 replaced on 11/4/2024) (smy). [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
PAPERLESS COURTROOM DESIGNATION FOR REOPENED DETENTION HEARING. The REOPENED Detention Hearing scheduled for tomorrow, November 5, 2024 at 10:30 a.m., will be held in Courtroom 203E at the Federal Courthouse in Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/4/2024. (ar2) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06500-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle: Detention Hearing as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez held on 11/5/2024. Witness HSI Agent David Franklin testified. Bond recommendation/set: Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez (1) Pretrial Detention. Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 11:49:43) Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/5/2024. (ar2) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
RENEWED ORAL MOTION for Pretrial Detention by USA as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez. (ar2) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
RENEWED ORAL MOTION for Bond by Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez. (ar2) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
PAPERLESS ORDER denying [DE 17] Renewed Oral Motion for Bond as to Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/5/2024. (ar2) [0:24-mj-06502-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch: Report Re: Counsel Hearing as to David Martinez NOT held on 11/6/2024, Detention Hearing as to David Martinez NOT held on 11/6/2024. Arraignment set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing set for 11/7/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing set for 11/7/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (Digital 11:26:33) Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 11/6/2024. (rbe) [0:24-mj-06504-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch: Detention Hearing as to Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez NOT held on 11/6/2024. Bond recommendation/set: Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez (1) Pretrial Detention (Stipulated).Arraignment set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Preliminary Examination set for 11/12/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Spanish Interpreter present. (Digital 11:16:41) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 11/6/2024. (rbe)[0:24-mj-06505-AOV]
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
11
pgs
INDICTMENT as to Onasis Lisandro Garcia (1) count(s) 1, 3, 4, 5, Juan Antonio Rivera Velasquez (2) count(s) 1, 2, David Martinez (3) count(s) 1, 2, Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez (4) count(s) 1, 2, Richard John Sydney-Smith (5) count(s) 1, 3, 4, 5 and Forfeiture Allegations. (rbe) (rbe).
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
(11/7/2024) Restricted Unredacted Indictment
|
20
|
|
20
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch: Report Re Counsel Hearing as to David Martinez held on 11/7/2024. For the reasons stated on the record, the time from today through the rescheduled date is excluded from the deadline for trial as computed under the Speedy Trial Act. The Court finds that the ends of justice served by granting this continuance outweigh the interests of the defendant and the public in a speedy trial. Time excluded from 11/7/2024 until 11/19/2024. Detention Hearing as to David Martinez NOT held on 11/7/2024. ( Arraignment reset for 11/19/2024 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Detention Hearing reset for 11/19/2024 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. Report Re: Counsel Hearing reset for 11/19/2024 at 10:30 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge). (Digital 11:23:54) It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States obligation to disclose to the defendant all exculpatory evidence- that is, evidence that favors the defendant or casts doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and ORDERS the United States to do so. The government has a duty to disclose any evidence that goes to negating the defendants guilt, the credibility of a witness, or that would reduce a potential sentence. The defendant is entitled to this information without a request. Failure to disclose exculpatory evidence in a timely manner may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, or sanctions by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 11/7/2024. (ar2)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
NOTICE OF TEMPORARY ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jordan M. Lewin appearing for David Martinez. (ar2)
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
DEFENSE ORAL MOTION to Continue Report Re: Counsel hearing by David Martinez. (ar2)
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
PAPERLESS ORDER granting [DE 22] Oral Motion to Continue Report Re: Counsel hearing as to David Martinez (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 11/7/2024. (ar2)
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
DEFENSE ORAL MOTION to Continue Pretrial Detention hearing by David Martinez. (ar2)
Related: [-]
|
25
|
|
25
PAPERLESS ORDER granting [DE 24] Oral Motion to Continue Pretrial Detention hearing as to David Martinez (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 11/7/2024. (ar2)
Related: [-]
|
26
|
|
26
5
pgs
ORDER GRANTING 11 and 16 the Government's Oral Motions for Pretrial Detention as to Defendant Carlos Manuel Velazquez Gomez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 11/7/2024. See attached document for full details. (lbe)
Related: [-]
|