Meltwater News US Inc. v. Tveyes, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-09699 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 08, 2024 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 1:12 AM PST |
Defendant
Tveyes, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Meltwater News US Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 19, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING OSC (Doc.20 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: In light of Plaintiff's filing of a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of this action (Doc.21 ), the Court's prior Order to Show Cause ("OSC") (Doc. 20) is hereby discharged. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Monday, November 18, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Meltwater News US Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Gibson, John) |
|
Friday, November 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Meltwater is ORDERED to show cause, in a response of no more than three (3) pages, no later than 11/19/2024, why the Court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. TVEyes may file a reply of no more than three (3) pages no later than 11/22/2024. (jp) |
|
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan Berthelsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Tveyes, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38580864)16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District for the practice of law, in which the attorney is physically present on a regular basis to conduct business. (sbou) |
|
Thursday, November 14, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant TVEyes, Inc.'s Termination And/Or Modification To Its API Feeds and Podcast Monitoring Service 7 filed by Defendant Tveyes, Inc..(Schlafer, Scott) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott Evan Schlafer on behalf of Defendant Tveyes, Inc. (Attorney Scott Evan Schlafer added to party Tveyes, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schlafer, Scott) |
|
16 | 16
![]() APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stefan Berthelsin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Tveyes, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38580864) filed by Defendant Tveyes, Inc.. (Eiseman, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Eiseman, IV on behalf of Defendant Tveyes, Inc. (Attorney David Eiseman, IV added to party Tveyes, Inc.(pty:dft))(Eiseman, David) |
|
14 | 14
![]() INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (kd) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to this Court's General Order in the Matter of Assignment of Cases and Duties to the District Judges.by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Case transferred from Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett to the calendar of Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:24-cv-09699 JLS(JPRx). (rn) |
|
Wednesday, November 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-09699 SPG(JPRx). (rn) |
|
11 | 11
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)6 as to Defendant Tveyes, Inc. (lh) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Defendant TVEyes, Inc.'s Termination And/Or Modification To Its API Feeds and Podcast Monitoring Service filed by Plaintiff Meltwater News US Inc.. (Gibson, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38561031 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Meltwater News US Inc..(Gibson, John) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, November 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Meltwater News US Inc. identifying MW Investment B.V. as Corporate Parent. (Gibson, John) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Meltwater News US Inc., identifying Meltwater News US Inc.. (Attorney John S. Gibson added to party Meltwater News US Inc.(pty:pla))(Gibson, John) |
|
3 | 3
![]() ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Plaintiff Meltwater News US Inc.. The Plaintiff does not consent. (Gibson, John) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)1 filed by plaintiff Meltwater News US Inc.. (Gibson, John) |
|
1 | 1
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Meltwater News US Inc.. (Gibson, John) |