California Northern District Court
Judge:Laurel Beeler
Case #: 3:24-cv-07853
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 23, 2024 1:10 AM PST
Defendant
City and County of San Francisco
Defendant
Alisa Somera
Defendant
Shamann Walton
Plaintiff
Michael Anthony Petrelis
Represented By
Donald Cloyce Wagda
Donald Wagda
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
33 33 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/22 8:36 AM
ORDER re: 32 Joint Stipulation to Continue Hearing. Motion Hearing 25 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint set previously set for 4/23/2025 is reset to 5/15/2025 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 04/22/2025. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
32 32 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 04/21 3:17 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re25 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint , 31 Clerk's Notice,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,,, Terminate Hearings,, Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Hearing re Defendants' Pending Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Michael Anthony Petrelis. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
31 31 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 04/18 2:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING: The court has jury selection scheduled on 4/24/2025 and thus advances the motion hearing to 4/23/2025 at 9:30 AM. Motion Hearing 25 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint set for 4/23/2025 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
30 30 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 04/10 2:38 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byCity and County of San Francisco, Alisa Somera, Shamann Walton. (Steeley, Tara)
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
29 29 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 04/01 11:58 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byMichael Anthony Petrelis. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-] 25 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint
Monday, March 24, 2025
28 28 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/24 8:58 AM
ORDER re: 27 Stipulation to Extend Opposition and Reply Deadlines re Defendants' Pending Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Responses due by 4/1/2025. Replies due by 4/10/2025. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/24/2025. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
27 27 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 03/21 6:53 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re25 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Michael Anthony Petrelis. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
26 26 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/11 1:43 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: In light of the pending motion, the court continues the Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 4/17/2025 to 6/5/2025 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 5/29/2025. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Dismiss Tue 03/11 12:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by City and County of San Francisco, Alisa Somera, Shamann Walton. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 4/24/2025 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. Responses due by 3/25/2025. Replies due by 4/1/2025.(Steeley, Tara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to RJN
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
24 24 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/12 11:00 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City and County of San Francisco, Alisa Somera, Shamann Walton.. (Steeley, Tara)
Related: [-]
23 23 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Wed 02/12 10:26 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 2/26/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Wed 02/12 10:05 AM
STIPULATION Extending Defendants Time To Respond To The First Amended Complaint filed by City and County of San Francisco, Alisa Somera, Shamann Walton. (Steeley, Tara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/06 2:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Anthony Petrelis. Shamann Walton served on 2/4/2025, answer due 2/25/2025. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/06 2:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Anthony Petrelis. Alisa Somera served on 2/4/2025, answer due 2/25/2025. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Thu 02/06 10:47 AM
***Incorrect event used. [err101] Please refile in its entirety, using event: Summons Returned Executed When prompted, please select the applicable party(ies) and enter the dates(s) of service***[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101]Please re-file in its entirety. Re:18 Certificate of Service filed by Michael Anthony Petrelis,19 Certificate of Service filed by Michael Anthony Petrelis (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
19 19 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 02/05 11:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Anthony Petrelis re10 Summons Issued re Defendant Shamann Walton (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Certificate/Proof of Service Wed 02/05 11:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Anthony Petrelis re10 Summons Issued re Defendant Alisa Somera (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 02/03 9:34 AM
ORDER re: 16 Ex Parte Application to Continue Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 2/13/2025 is reset to 4/17/2025 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2025.This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/03/2025. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
16 16 motion Ex Parte Application Fri 01/31 11:59 PM
Ex Parte Application to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Michael Anthony Petrelis. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/31 2:45 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Anthony Petrelis. Shamann Walton served on 1/28/2025, answer due 2/18/2025. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 01/31 2:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Anthony Petrelis. Alisa Somera served on 1/28/2025, answer due 2/18/2025. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 misc Receipt Wed 01/29 9:36 AM
Receipt of acknowledgment from US Marshal Office. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
12 12 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 01/23 2:11 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael Anthony Petrelis (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
11 11 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 01/23 1:59 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 01/22 4:20 PM
Summons Issued as to City and County of San Francisco, Alisa Somera, Shamann Walton.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 285 US Marshal Form,
Att: 4 285 US Marshal Form,
Att: 5 285 US Marshal Form
utility Remark Thu 01/23 3:39 PM
Remark - Service packet delivered to the U.S. Marshal Service Post Box in the Clerk's Office mail room. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
9 9 misc Proposed Summons Fri 01/17 12:58 AM
Proposed Summons. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/17 12:56 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive and Declaratory Relief for Violation of Civil Rights against All Defendants. Filed by Michael Anthony Petrelis.(Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Redline of FAC v. original Complaint
Monday, November 25, 2024
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/25 10:56 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Anthony Petrelis.. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
6 6 utility Remark Mon 11/18 10:33 AM
Remark- To ensure that proper service is made, the address(es) of the defendant(s) must be submitted to this office. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 11/18 8:56 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ejk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 11/12 10:34 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2025 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 11/12 8:26 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 11/08 11:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Anthony Petrelis. (Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/08 11:42 PM
COMPLAINT Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief for Violation of Civil Rights against All Defendants. Filed by Michael Anthony Petrelis.(Wagda, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet