Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:24-cv-02051
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
CauseAmericans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 7:01 AM EDT
Defendant
GH2 NSB BB, LLC
Represented By
Michael Stanley Rywant
Rywant, Alvarez, Jones, Russo & Guyton, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael R. McNeil
Represented By
Sara R. Howeller
Law Office Of Sara Howeller
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Terminated: 04/21/2025
Represented By
Kimberly Rivera
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Charles A. Powell, IV
Littler Mendelson
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing - Reschedule Thu 05/08 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Status Conference hearing previously scheduled for 5/13/2025 is rescheduled as a Telephone Status Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 9:30 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. The parties shall call 1-855-244-8681 ten minutes before the hearing is scheduled to begin. Access Code: 2312 913 3780.(RMF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/21 2:23 PM
ORDER re 19 NOTICE of settlement Solely As To Defendant Dollar Tree Stores Inc.: it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the claims against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. as a Defendant in the above-styled action and amend the case style accordingly. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 4/21/2025. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of settlement Wed 04/16 10:59 AM
NOTICE of settlement Solely As To Defendant Dollar Tree Stores Inc. by Michael R. McNeil (Howeller, Sara)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/17 4:12 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc..(Rivera, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 01/06 3:03 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by GH2 NSB BB, LLC. (Rywant, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 01/02 4:24 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 6:24-cv-2051-WWB-UAM. Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd no longer assigned to the case. (RPB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 3:16 PM
GH2 NSB BB, LLC's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by GH2 NSB BB, LLC.(Rywant, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
14 14 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 12/18 9:31 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Charles Powell IV of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ARL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 12/17 5:09 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Charles A. Powell, IV on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Charles A. Powell, IV. (Powell, Charles)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/17 3:25 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., may have until and through January 17, 2025, to respond to the Complaint. Plaintiff may have until and through January 27, 2025, to inspect the property. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 12/17/2024. (Kidd, Embry)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 12/17 1:44 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Charles A. Powell, IV, Kimberly Rivera of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EVK)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Complaint Tue 12/17 11:16 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Rivera, Kimberly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. Modified docket text on 12/17/2024 (EVK)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
9 9 7 pgs order Order setting status conference Mon 11/25 3:37 PM
ADA SCHEDULING ORDER. Status Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in Orlando Courtroom 3 B before Judge Wendy W. Berger. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/25/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order Mon 11/25 3:32 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective April 1, 2024, and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. Additionally, the undersigned has issued a Standing Order, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/judges/wendy-berger, that apply to all proceedings before the undersigned. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules and this Court's Standing Orders. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 11/25/2024. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
7 7 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Fri 11/22 1:15 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories by Michael R. McNeil.(Howeller, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt,
Att: 2 Cases List
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/13 1:19 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Michael R. McNeil. (Howeller, Sara)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 11/13 1:19 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michael R. McNeil. Related case(s): No (Howeller, Sara)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 11/13 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Sara R. Howeller on behalf of Michael R. McNeil. Lead Counsel: Sara Howeller Esq.. (Howeller, Sara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
3 3 service Summons issued Tue 11/12 10:15 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., GH2 NSB BB, LLC. (JDR)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/12 9:03 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:24-cv-2051-WWB-EJK. (RPB)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 10, 2024
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 11/10 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22706112) filed by Michael R. McNeil.(Howeller, Sara)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons GH2 NSB BB LLC,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons DOLLAR TREE STORES INC