Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Georgia N Alexakis
Case #: 1:24-cv-11570
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2024
Terminated:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 4:55 AM CDT
Defendant
whisey0
Defendant
primeprestige
Defendant
mbonlinedeals21
Defendant
kincho0126
Defendant
guy_store45
Defendant
edirisinghekumisikani0
Defendant
Nhpoi
Defendant
FrSara
Defendant
BZGG
Defendant
ASNUG
Defendant
3lbthrift
Plaintiff
Guangdong Aoyun Technology Co Ltd.
Represented By
He Cheng
Palmer Law Group, P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Netraty
Terminated: 12/09/2024
Defendant
ZhuCheng-US
Terminated: 12/09/2024
Defendant
Nodinsy
Terminated: 12/09/2024
Defendant
MKG-US
Terminated: 12/09/2024
Defendant
Losiny
Terminated: 12/09/2024
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Terminated: 12/04/2024


Docket last updated: 03/25/2025 4:02 AM CDT
Sunday, November 10, 2024
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Guangdong Aoyun Technology Co Ltd.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22710514.(Cheng, He)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 1 - U.S. Patent No. 11,916,334,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - US CBP Report,
Att: 3 48 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Law Journal Article,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - US DHS Report
2 2 1 pgs ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Guangdong Aoyun Technology Co Ltd. by He Cheng (Cheng, He)
Related: [-]
3 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cheng, He)
Related: [-]