Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-11068

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John T Dorsey
Case #: 1:24-ap-50204
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Working America
Represented By
Working America
contact info
Plaintiff
FTX Trading Ltd.
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alameda Research Ltd.
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
West Realm Shires, Inc.
167 N Green Street Suite 1102
Chicago, IL 60607
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
West Realm Shires Services, Inc.
167 N Green Street Suite 1102
Chicago, IL 60607
Represented By
Matthew B. McGuire
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 12:47 PM
Order Approving Fourth Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Order Signed on 5/1/2025. (Mml)
Related: [-] 1 ,6 ,8 ,12 ,17 ,20
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
20 20 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Wed 04/30 12:30 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Fourth Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by FTX Recovery Trust. (Robertson, Howard)
Related: [-] 1 ,6 ,8 ,12 ,17
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, April 17, 2025
19 19 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Thu 04/17 6:54 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Nelson Crespin Regarding Order Approving Third Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 17
18 18 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Thu 04/17 6:45 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Reese Campanalonga Regarding Certification of Counsel . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 16
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/01 5:40 PM
Order Approving Third Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Order Signed on 4/1/2025. (Mml)
Related: [-] 1 ,8 ,12 ,16
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 31, 2025
16 16 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Mon 03/31 3:16 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Third Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by FTX Recovery Trust. (Robertson, Howard)
Related: [-] 1 ,6 ,8 ,12
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Friday, March 14, 2025
15 15 court Case Reassigned Fri 03/14 3:14 PM
Order of Reassignment. Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge John T Dorsey Terminated (KAR)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
14 14 misc Exhibit Fri 02/14 9:49 PM
Exhibit(s) (Notice of Substitution of Plaintiff) Filed by FTX Recovery Trust. (Robertson, Howard)
Related: [-]
13 13 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Fri 02/14 2:40 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Brian Horman Regarding Order Approving Second Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, January 24, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/24 9:10 AM
Order Approving Second Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Order Signed on 1/24/2025. (LJH)
Related: [-] 1 ,6 ,8 ,11
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, January 23, 2025
11 11 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Thu 01/23 4:12 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Approving Second Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Alameda Research Ltd., FTX Trading Ltd., West Realm Shires Services, Inc., West Realm Shires, Inc.. (Robertson, Howard)
Related: [-] 1 ,6 ,8
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED) - Notice Wed 01/22 1:14 PM
HEARING CANCELLED. Notice of Agenda of Matters not going forward. The following hearing has been cancelled. Filed by FTX Recovery Trust. Hearing scheduled for 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Pierce, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
9 9 claims Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing Tue 12/17 4:24 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Mailing of Amy Castillo Regarding Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint . Filed by Kroll Restructuring Administration LLC. Related [+] (Malo, David)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, December 05, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Thu 12/05 2:03 PM
Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Order Signed on 12/5/2024. (LJH)
Related: [-] 1 ,7
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 12/05 1:47 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint Related [+] Filed by Alameda Research Ltd., FTX Trading Ltd., West Realm Shires Services, Inc., West Realm Shires, Inc.. (Robertson, Howard)
Related: [-] 1 ,6
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
6 6 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 11/26 4:39 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Working America. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Robertson, Howard)
Related: [-] ument1
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 order Appear pro hac vice Fri 11/22 12:19 PM
Order Granting Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Rachel Ehrlich Albanese Related [+] Order Signed on 11/22/2024. (LJH)
Related: [-] 4
4 4 2 pgs motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 11/22 10:37 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Rachel Ehrlich Albanese . Receipt Number 4392220, Filed by Working America. (Sarna, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance - Notice Fri 11/22 10:17 AM
Notice of Appearance. Filed by Working America (Sarna, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
misc Add Attorney Fri 11/22 10:20 AM
Attorney Rachel E. Albanese and Matthew Steven Sarna for Working America added to case Filed by Working America. (Sarna, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 11/08 8:51 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 24-50204 JTD] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A11884319, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Fri 11/08 5:12 PM
Adversary case 24-50204 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Transfer Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 544, 548, and 550 and Del. Code Ann. Tit. 6, §§ 1304 and 1305 by FTX Trading Ltd., Alameda Research Ltd., West Realm Shires, Inc., West Realm Shires Services, Inc. against Working America. Fee Amount $350 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 2/6/2025. (McGuire, Matthew)
Related: [-]