Connecticut District Court
Judge:Sarala V Nagala
Referred: S Dave Vatti
Case #: 3:24-cv-01788
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2024
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
9249-9557 Quebec, Inc.
Defendant
Bripan S.A.R.L.
Defendant
Socipar S.A.S.
Plaintiff
American Industrial Acquisition Corporation
Represented By
William N. Wright
Cummings & Lockwood - Stmfd
contact info
Plaintiff
KK Bakery Investment Company, LLC
Represented By
William N. Wright
Cummings & Lockwood - Stmfd
contact info
Plaintiff
Leonard Levie
Represented By
William N. Wright
Cummings & Lockwood - Stmfd
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
16 16 order Order Dismissing Case Tue 03/18 4:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice in light of Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal at ECF No.15 . The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 3/18/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Wed 03/19 1:18 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Bergeson, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
15 15 1 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/17 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Socipar S.A.S., Bripan S.A.R.L. and 9249-9557 Quebec, Inc. by American Industrial Acquisition Corporation, KK Bakery Investment Company, LLC, Leonard Levie (Wright, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
14 14 order Order Tue 02/11 11:08 AM
ORDER. Plaintiffs report that they will need at least three additional months to serve Defendants. If Defendants have not been served by May 12, 2025 , Plaintiffs shall submit a status report on that date informing the Court of its efforts to serve Defendants. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 2/11/2025. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
13 13 misc Status Report Mon 02/10 4:52 PM
STATUS REPORT regarding Service of Process by KK Bakery Investment Company, LLC, American Industrial Acquisition Corporation, Leonard Levie. (Wright, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
12 12 order Order Wed 11/13 5:22 PM
ORDER. Because Defendants appear to be foreign corporations, see Compl. paras. 5-7, the 90-day time limit for service of process from Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) does not apply. To keep service of process from unduly stalling this case, if Defendants have not been served by February 10, 2025 , Plaintiffs shall submit a status report on that date informing the Court of its efforts to serve Defendants. Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/13/2024. (Vo, C)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 11/13 3:18 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *9249-9557 Quebec, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William N. Wright* *Cummings & Lockwood - Stmfd* *Six Landmark Square* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 11/13 3:17 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Bripan S.A.R.L.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William N. Wright* *Cummings & Lockwood - Stmfd* *Six Landmark Square* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Electronic Summons Issued Wed 11/13 3:15 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Socipar S.A.S.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William N. Wright* *Cummings & Lockwood - Stmfd* *Six Landmark Square* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 order Electronic Service Documents Tue 11/12 1:07 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,5 Electronic Filing Order,7 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,1 Complaint, filed by American Industrial Acquisition Corporation, Leonard Levie, KK Bakery Investment Company, LLC,6 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 10:09 AM
Disclosure Statement by KK Bakery Investment Company, LLC, American Industrial Acquisition Corporation, Leonard Levie. (Wright, William)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Tue 11/12 4:33 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to 9249-9557 Quebec, Inc.. (Wright, William)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Tue 11/12 4:37 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Bripan S.A.R.L.. (Wright, William)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Tue 11/12 4:37 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Socipar S.A.S.. (Wright, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
7 7 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Tue 11/12 12:57 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Tue 11/12 12:56 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/11/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 11/12 12:55 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Sarala V. Nagala on 11/11/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 11/12 12:41 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2025 Discovery due by 5/13/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 6/17/2025 Signed by Clerk on 11/11/2024.(Gaskins, A)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 9:57 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/11/24.(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/11 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7964579.), filed by KK Bakery Investment Company, LLC, Leonard Levie, American Industrial Acquisition Corporation.(Wright, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 11/12 10:48 AM
Judge Sarala V. Nagala and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Oliver, T.)
Related: [-]