Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Carl J Barbier
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:24-cv-02647
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2024
Case in other court:21st Judicial District Court, 20240001774
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 7:02 AM CDT
Defendant
Everspan Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By
Elton Ford Duncan, III
Duncan & Sevin, LLC
contact info
Kelley A. Sevin
Duncan & Sevin, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Darrin Harris
Represented By
Ney Jan Gehman
Perrier & Lacoste, LLC
contact info
Guy D. Perrier
Perrier & Lacoste, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Total Package, LLC
Represented By
Ney Jan Gehman
Perrier & Lacoste, LLC
contact info
Guy D. Perrier
Perrier & Lacoste, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wanda Hammac
Represented By
Ashley Anderson Traylor
Anderson Traylor Edwards
contact info
Scott Campbell Sledge
Anderson Traylor Edwards
contact info
Christopher J. Edwards, Jr.
Anderson Traylor Edwards
contact info
Britney Renee Duke
B. Duke Law Firm LLC
contact info
Joseph Thomas Anderson
Anderson Boutwell Traylor
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 02/20 2:57 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2025 02:00 PM before Judge Carl J Barbier. Jury Trial set for 12/8/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Carl J Barbier. All discovery must be completed by 10/21/2025. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier.(gla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Tue 01/28 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2025 02:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(amj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
7 7 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Thu 12/19 9:23 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure Attorney filed in error, refiled at doc.6 (gla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
6 6 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Wed 12/18 6:45 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Everspan Indemnity Insurance Company (Duncan, Elton)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Statement Wed 12/18 6:42 PM
Statement by Everspan Indemnity Insurance Company (Duncan, Elton)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Wed 12/18 6:37 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Everspan Indemnity Insurance Company (Duncan, Elton)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
3 3 misc Initial Case Assignment Tue 11/12 8:56 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl J Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Mon 11/11 4:08 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Total Package, LLC (Gehman, Ney)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 11/11 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st Judicial District Court, case number 20240001774 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10767266) filed by Darrin Harris, Total Package, LLC.Attorney Ney Jan Gehman added to party Total Package, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ney Jan Gehman added to party Darrin Harris (pty:dft).(Gehman, Ney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 2 Exhibit B -Stipulation Pleading,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Responses to Request for Admissions,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Everspan Consent to Removal,
Att: 5 Verification,
Att: 6 Certificate Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) Directive,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet