Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Denise Page Hood
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:24-cv-12986
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 8:03 AM EDT
Defendant
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Molly Pallman
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Alexandra C. Markel
Bodman PLC
contact info
Justin Bernick
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Jennifer Fleury
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Sarah L. Cylkowski
Bodman PLC
contact info
Michelle R. Heikka
Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Michigan
contact info
Plaintiff
Utility Workers Union of America National Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By
Justin M. Wolber
Varnum LLP
contact info
Perrin Rynders
Varnum, Riddering,
contact info
Aaron M. Phelps
Varnum, Riddering,
contact info
Julia Moran
Varnum LLP
contact info
Eric Bruce Snyder
Bailey & Glasser
contact info
Herman D. Hofman
Varnum Attorneys At Law
contact info
John W Barrett
Bailey & Glasser
contact info
Lauren E. Crummel
Watkins Pawlick Calati Prifti PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Wesco, Inc.
Represented By
Justin M. Wolber
Varnum LLP
contact info
Perrin Rynders
Varnum, Riddering,
contact info
Aaron M. Phelps
Varnum, Riddering,
contact info
Julia Moran
Varnum LLP
contact info
Eric Bruce Snyder
Bailey & Glasser
contact info
Herman D. Hofman
Varnum Attorneys At Law
contact info
John W Barrett
Bailey & Glasser
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/12 4:39 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2025 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/16 2:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint . Motion Hearing reset for 5/21/2025 03:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/01 4:21 PM
REPLY to Response re20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Markel, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 04/01 12:01 PM
ORDER Granting24 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
25 25 respm Response to Motion Thu 03/27 10:12 AM
RESPONSE to24 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Phelps, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
24 24 motion File Excess Pages Wed 03/26 2:47 PM
Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for its Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Markel, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2
Friday, March 21, 2025
23 23 notice Appearance Fri 03/21 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Moran on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Moran, Julia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
22 22 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/11 3:50 PM
RESPONSE to20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs. (Phelps, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
21 21 notice Hearing on Motion* Tue 02/04 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF IN PERSON HEARING on20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2025 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (LSau)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
20 20 motion Dismiss Tue 01/28 6:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Cylkowski, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17
19 19 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 01/28 5:02 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Emergent Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate LifeSecure Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate BCS Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Behavioral Health Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Strategic Services Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont, Other Affiliate Michigan Medicaid Holdings Company, Other Affiliate Woodward Straits Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Financial Services Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Services Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Provider-Related Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Shell Holding Company I, LLC, Other Affiliate Shell Holding Company II, LLC, Other Affiliate Pharmacy-Related Holding Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Care Transformation Holding Company, Other Affiliate BMH LLC, Other Affiliate Vista HoldCo LLC, Other Affiliate Blue Care Network of Michigan for Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Cylkowski, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
18 18 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 01/17 3:31 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Molly Pallman appearing on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company (Pallman, Molly)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 01/17 3:29 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jennifer Fleury appearing on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company (Fleury, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 01/17 3:27 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Justin Bernick appearing on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company (Bernick, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 01/16 3:46 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michelle R. Heikka appearing on behalf of All Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan (Heikka, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
14 14 minutes ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order Mon 12/23 2:57 PM
STIPULATED ORDER to extend deadlines for motion to dismiss briefing. ( Defendant's motion to dismiss due 1/28/2025. Response due by 3/11/2025. , Reply due by 4/1/2025. ) Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (DPer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
13 13 notice Appearance Tue 12/17 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra C. Markel on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Markel, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Appearance Tue 12/17 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah L. Cylkowski on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company. (Cylkowski, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
11 11 notice Appearance Mon 12/16 12:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Bruce Snyder on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Snyder, Eric)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 Day Fri 11/22 9:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. All Defendants. (Rynders, Perrin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 notice Appearance Tue 11/19 11:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Wolber on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wolber, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
8 8 notice Appearance Fri 11/15 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John W Barrett on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Barrett, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
7 7 service Summons Issued* Tue 11/12 1:40 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Mutual Insurance Company* (JHea)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Attorney Appearance Tue 11/12 10:50 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lauren E. Crummel appearing on behalf of Utility Workers Union of America National Health and Welfare Fund (Crummel, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
5 5 notice Appearance Mon 11/11 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Herman D. Hofman on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hofman, Herman)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance Mon 11/11 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Perrin Rynders on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rynders, Perrin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 11/11 4:36 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Utility Workers Union of America National Health and Welfare Fund (Phelps, Aaron)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 11/11 4:35 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Wesco, Inc. (Phelps, Aaron)
Related: [-]
1 1 79 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Mon 11/11 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10009099 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Muskegon - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Phelps, Aaron)
Related: [-]