Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Jose E Martinez
Case #: 1:24-cv-24434
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2024
Re-opened:Apr 03, 2025
Terminated:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 10, 2025 7:59 AM EDT
Defendant
EMP-Bindi International Association
Represented By
Frederic Jorge Rocafort-Pabon
Harris Bricken Sliwoski, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Friends of Barefoot College International Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan W. Thomas
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
contact info
Evan S Nadel
Kilpatrick Townsend Stockton, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
28 28 order Order Referring Motion Fri 05/09 2:12 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING18 Motion to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry of Default to Eduardo I. Sanchez, United States Magistrate Judge, for a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/9/2025. (knu)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Reply in Support of Motion Fri 05/09 2:05 PM
Defendant's REPLY in Support of Motion re18 MOTION to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default, . filed by EMP-Bindi International Association. (Rocafort-Pabon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
26 26 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/02 5:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re18 MOTION to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default, (Declaration of E. Nadel) filed by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc..(Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
25 25 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/02 5:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re18 MOTION to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default, (Declaration of Kabir Hathi) filed by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc..(Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
24 24 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/02 5:04 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re18 MOTION to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default, (Declaration of Aaron Lukken re Effort to Serve Defendant)) filed by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc.. (Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response to Motion Fri 05/02 5:00 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default, filed by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc.. Replies due by 5/9/2025. (Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
22 22 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 04/18 2:46 PM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Rule 7.1 by EMP-Bindi International Association (Rocafort-Pabon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
21 21 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 04/18 2:43 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by EMP-Bindi International Association. (Rocafort-Pabon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Fri 04/18 2:41 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re18 MOTION to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default, Harsh Tiwari filed by EMP-Bindi International Association.(Rocafort-Pabon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Aura Email
19 19 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Fri 04/18 2:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re18 MOTION to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default, of Dan Harris filed by EMP-Bindi International Association.(Rocafort-Pabon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Email with Aaron Lukken
18 18 motion Vacate Fri 04/18 2:36 PM
MOTION to Vacate14 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default, by EMP-Bindi International Association. Responses due by 5/2/2025.(Rocafort-Pabon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, April 14, 2025
17 17 notice Certificate of Counsel Mon 04/14 4:00 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 16 Clerk's Notice Administratively Closing Case,,,,, by Evan S Nadel on behalf of Friends of Barefoot College International Inc. (Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
16 16 order Clerk's Notice Administratively Closing Case Fri 04/11 2:30 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Administratively Closing Case for statistical purposes due to14 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant and setting Final Default Judgment procedure. On or before April 18, 2025 , Defendant shall (1) file an answer or other response to the Complaint, and (2) file a motion to set aside the Clerk's Default that shows good cause for Defendant's failure to timely respond to the Complaint. If Defendant fails to do so, default final judgment may be entered. In other words, Defendant must object to the Clerk's Default by the above deadline or Plaintiff may be able to obtain the relief requested in its Complaint. On or before April 25, 2025 , Plaintiff shall file a motion for final default judgment that includes affidavits of the amounts due by Defendant, if necessary, and any other supporting documentation necessary to determine the measure of damages and/or conclude this action. Plaintiff shall send a copy of the motion to Defendant's counsel, or to Defendant itself, if Defendant does not have counsel. In the certificate of service, Plaintiff shall indicate that notice was sent and the address to where it was sent. Plaintiff's failure to file a motion for final default judgment within the specified time will result in a dismissal without prejudice. Plaintiff shall immediately send a copy of this Order to Defendant and file a certificate of service on the record. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/11/2025. (knu)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Fri 04/11 3:03 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE #16: EMP-Bindi International Association response/answer due 4/18/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/09 12:06 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frederic Jorge Rocafort-Pabon on behalf of EMP-Bindi International Association. Attorney Frederic Jorge Rocafort-Pabon added to party EMP-Bindi International Association(pty:dft). (Rocafort-Pabon, Frederic)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
14 14 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Mon 04/07 3:52 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to EMP-BINDI INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION, an entity organized under the laws of India - Motions Terminated:13 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/7/2025. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
13 13 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fri 04/04 3:48 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to EMP-Bindi International Association by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc.. (Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/03 11:22 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting11 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Case. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to REOPEN this case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/3/2025. (knu)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/03 11:15 AM
MOTION to lift Order administratively closing this case re 9 Clerk's Notice Administratively Closing Case, by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc..(Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Case Reopened Fri 04/04 4:12 PM
Case Reopened per DE #12 ORDER. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
10 10 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service ABROAD/INTERNATIONAL Service Fri 03/28 7:07 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc.. EMP-Bindi International Association served on 2/24/2025, response/answer due 3/17/2025. (Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
9 9 order Clerk's Notice Administratively Closing Case Tue 02/11 4:22 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER administratively closing case for statistical purposes only in light of8 Plaintiff's Status Report Regarding Service of Process on Defendant in India. This shall not affect the substantive rights of the parties. Plaintiff shall move to lift the administrative closure after Defendant has been served. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/11/2025. (knu)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Status Report Tue 02/11 4:04 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Process on Defendant in India by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc. (Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 12/05 10:13 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jonathan Thomas. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/5/2024. (knu)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - aty Tue 12/03 5:22 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jonathan Thomas. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18024951 by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc.. Responses due by 12/17/2024.(Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 11/12 5:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc. (Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Bar Letter Tue 11/12 3:42 PM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jonathan Thomas, mailing date November 12, 2024, (pt)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 11/12 1:06 PM
Summons Issued as to EMP-Bindi International Association. (ar24)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 11/12 1:04 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 11/11 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT against EMP-Bindi International Association. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17974440, filed by Friends of Barefoot College International Inc..(Nadel, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summon(s)