New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sean H Lane
Case #: 7:24-bk-22986
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2024
Dismissed:Apr 15, 2025
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025

Debtor
Newark Realty Plus LLC
PO Box 766
Monsey, NY 10952-0766
Represented By
Newark Realty Plus LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Petitioning Creditor
David Roth
700 Pleasant Valley Way
West Orange, NJ 07052
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 2:22 PM EDT
Sunday, November 10, 2024
1 1 4 pgs misc Involuntary Petition Chapter 7 (Fee) Tue 11/12 10:53 AM
Involuntary Petition Against A Non-Individual (Chapter 7) (Fee Amount $ 338.) Related [+] Against: Newark Realty Plus LLC . Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): David Roth. (Rai, Narotam)
Related: [-] ceipt Number FeeNotPaid.