Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11636

Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Janet E Bostwick
Case #: 1:24-ap-01095
Nature of Suit1 null
2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
National Lumber Company
71 Maple St. PO Box 32
Mansfield, MA 02048
Represented By
National Lumber Company
contact info
Defendant
National Lumber Company LLC
2001 BRYAN ST, STE 1600
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
National Lumber Company LLC
contact info
Defendant
National Lumber Massachusetts Business Trust
71 Maple Street
Mansfield, MA 02048
Represented By
National Lumber Massachusetts Business Trust
contact info
Defendant
Steven Kaitz
24 Yarmouth Avenue
Brookline, MA 02467
Represented By
Steven Kaitz
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Buckley
P.O. Box 351 Unit # 8
Hull, MA 02045
Represented By
Michael Van Dam
Van Dam Law LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Samoset Development Corp.
10 Malta Street Unit 8
Hull, MA 02045
Represented By
Michael Van Dam
Van Dam Law LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Tue 01/14 10:26 AM
Endorsed Order dated 1/14/2025 Re:27 Motion filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley to Extend Time to Comply [Re:22 Order]. GRANTED. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
27 27 motion Extend Time Mon 01/13 12:59 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley to Extend Time to Comply [Re:22 Order] with certificate of service. (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Exhibit Mon 01/13 12:41 PM
Exhibit - State Court Docket Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-] 25 Statement
25 25 misc Statement Mon 01/13 9:55 AM
Statement filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley Related [+] (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-] 22 Order,1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley, Plaintiff Samoset Development Corp.
24 24 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/13 9:49 AM
Certificate of Service Re:25 Statement filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley,1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley. (Van Dam, Michael
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 04, 2025
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/05 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order
Thursday, January 02, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 01/02 1:07 PM
Order dated 1/2/2025 Re:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley, Plaintiff Samoset Development Corp. See Order for Full Text. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
21 21 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 12/16 12:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Samuel Rowley filed by Defendant National Lumber Company LLC (Rowley, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/12 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order on Generic Motion
Monday, December 09, 2024
19 19 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/09 1:00 PM
Summons Service Executed on Steven Kaitz 12/9/2024 (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/09 1:00 PM
Summons Service Executed on National Lumber Company LLC 12/9/2024 (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/09 12:59 PM
Summons Service Executed on National Lumber Company 12/9/2024 (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 12/09 12:59 PM
Summons Service Executed on National Lumber Massachusetts Business Trust 12/9/2024 (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Alias Summons Issued Mon 12/09 11:52 AM
Alias Summons Issued on Steven Kaitz Date Issued 12/9/2024, Answer Due 1/8/2025. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. Related [+] (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley, Plaintiff Samoset Development Corp.
14 14 court Alias Summons Issued Mon 12/09 11:50 AM
Alias Summons Issued on National Lumber Massachusetts Business Trust Date Issued 12/9/2024, Answer Due 1/8/2025. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. Related [+]. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley, Plaintiff Samoset Development Corp.
13 13 court Alias Summons Issued Mon 12/09 11:49 AM
Alias Summons Issued on National Lumber Company LLC Date Issued 12/9/2024, Answer Due 1/8/2025. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. Related [+]. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley, Plaintiff Samoset Development Corp.
12 12 court Alias Summons Issued Mon 12/09 11:47 AM
Alias Summons Issued on National Lumber Company Date Issued 12/9/2024, Answer Due 1/8/2025. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. Related [+]. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Steven Buckley, Plaintiff Samoset Development Corp.
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Mon 12/09 11:21 AM
Order dated 12/9/2024 Re:6 Motion filed by Plaintiff Stephen Buckley Reissue Summons. GRANTED AS FOLLOWS. THE COURT WILL ISSUE A NEW SUMMONS WITH RESPECT TO DEFENDANTS NATIONAL LUMBER COMPANY, NATIONAL LUMBER COMPANY LLC, NATIONAL LUMBER MASSACHUSETTS BUSINESS TRUST, AND STEVEN KAITZ. THE DEADLINE FOR THE DEFENDANTS TO FILE AND SERVE AN ANSWER OR RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT SHALL BE WITHIN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THE ISSUANCE OF THE NEW SUMMONS. (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Motion Fri 12/06 12:54 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Stephen Buckley Relief Pursuant to MLBR 9027-1 . (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified State Court Docket
9 9 misc Supplemental Document Fri 12/06 8:21 AM
Supplemental Document: Notice of State Court Docket Entry Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Stephen Buckley (Van Dam, Michael) Modified on 12/6/2024 (sl)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of State Court Docket Entry
Att: 1 State Court Docket (2) State Court Docket 2 (3) State Court Docket 3 (4) State Court Docket 4 (5) State Court Docket 5 (6) State Court Docket 6 (7) State Court Docket 7 (8) State Court Docket 8 (9) State Court Docket 9 (10) State Court Docket 9.1 (11) State Court Docket 9.2 (12) State Court Docket 9.3 (13) State Court Docket 9.4 (14) State Court Docket 9.5 (15) State Court Docket 9.6 (16) State Court Docket 9.7 (17) State Court Docket 9.8 (18) State Court Docket 10 (19) State Court Docket 10.0 (20) State Court Docket 10.2 (21) State Court Docket 10.3 (22) State Court Docket 10.4 (23) State Court Docket 10.5 (24) State Court Docket 10.6 (25) State Court Docket 10.7 (26) State Court Docket 10.8 (27) State Court Docket 11 (28) State Court Docket 11.1 (29) State Court Docket 11.2 (30) State Court Docket 11.3 (31) State Court Docket 11.4 (32) State Court Docket 11.5 (33) State Court Docket 11.6(34) State Court Docket 11.7 (35) State Court Docket 11.8 (36) State Court Docket 11.9 (37) State Court Docket 12 (38) State Court Docket 12.1 (39) State Court Docket 13 (40) State Court Docket 13.1 (41) State Court Docket 14 (42) State Court Docket 14.1(43) State Court Docket 16 (44) State Court Docket 17 (45) State Court Docket 17.1 (46) State Court Docket 18 (47) State Court Docket 19 (48) State Court Docket 20 (49) State Court Docket 21 (50) State Court Docket 21.1 (51) State Court Docket 22
8 8 notice Notice Fri 12/06 8:03 AM
Notice of State Court Docket Entry Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Stephen Buckley. (Van Dam, Michael) Modified on 12/6/2024 (sl)
Related: [-] 7 Exhibit
Thursday, December 05, 2024
7 7 misc Exhibit Thu 12/05 2:31 PM
Exhibit - State Court Docket filed by Plaintiff Stephen Buckley (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Motion Thu 12/05 1:57 PM
Motion filed by Plaintiff Stephen Buckley Reissue Summons . (Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 11/12 10:46 AM
Summons Issued on Steven Kaitz Answer Due 12/12/2024. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (Telam, Usbc) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2024 (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 11/12 10:46 AM
Summons Issued on National Lumber Massachusetts Business Trust Answer Due 12/12/2024. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (Telam, Usbc) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2024 (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 11/12 10:44 AM
Summons Issued on National Lumber Company LLC Answer Due 12/12/2024. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (Telam, Usbc) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2024 (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 11/12 10:43 AM
Summons Issued on National Lumber Company Answer Due 12/12/2024. Summons must be served within seven (7) days of issuance. (Telam, Usbc) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/12/2024 (Telam, Usbc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/12 10:18 AM
Adversary case 24-01095 Complaint by Stephen Buckley, Samoset Development Corp. against National Lumber Company, National Lumber Company LLC, National Lumber Massachusetts Business Trust, Steven Kaitz. Fee Amount of $350 is Deferred. Receipt Number DEFERRED. Nature of Suit(01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)))(Van Dam, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet