New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Natasha C Merle
Referred: Taryn A Merkl
Case #: 1:24-cv-07864
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Friday Dec 27, 2024 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Richard Olivieri
25 Jeanette Avenue
Staten Island, NY 10312
Represented By
Lily Anne Ockert
Sutton & Smyth, LLP
contact info
Leigh Harris Sutton
Sutton & Smyth, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Boris Gonzalez
929 Woodlawn Avenue
Linden, NJ 07306
Represented By
Robert Edward Brown
Robert E. Brown, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/01 10:04 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (AG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 03/31 5:07 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Richard Olivieri (Sutton, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 03/06 2:18 PM
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the Plaintiff's letter13 indicating that mediation was successful and the parties have reached a settlement in principle. The parties are respectfully directed to file a stipulation of dismissal by 4/7/2025 . All other case deadlines are temporarily stayed, sine die . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 3/6/2025. (ERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
13 13 misc Letter Wed 03/05 5:18 PM
Letter to Judge re Settlement by Boris Gonzalez (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Wed 03/05 3:07 PM
REPORT of Mediation Settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 3/19/2025. (DS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
adr Selection of Mediator Wed 02/19 4:53 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Andrew Berman selected as Mediator. Date Time and Location in-person/remote:3/4/25 Related [+]. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation. For more details on the submission, please consult Local Civil Rule 83.8(b)(4). Attendance is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Mediators contact information can be found on the docket sheet. Within fourteen days of the conclusion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report. (DS)
Related: [-] mote
Thursday, February 06, 2025
minutes Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/06 11:22 AM
Minute Entry and Order: A telephonic Initial Conference was held on 2/6/2025 before Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Appearances by Robert Brown for Plaintiff and Lily Ockert for Defendant. The parties confirmed that they have held their Rule 26(f) conference. The Court also reminded the parties of their obligations to preserve and, if appropriate, produce electronically stored information during discovery. As stated on the record, the parties' discovery plan is adopted, in part, as follows. Any HIPAA-compliant records authorizations shall be exchanged by 2/7/2025 . Rule 26(a) initial disclosures and first requests for documents and interrogatories shall be exchanged by 2/26/2025 . Phase I discovery shall be completed by 4/7/2025 . The deadline for joining additional parties and amending the pleadings as of right is 5/7/2025 . Fact discovery shall be completed on or before 6/2/2025 . The parties are directed to file a joint status report certifying the close of fact discovery by 6/9/2025 . Exchange of expert disclosures shall be completed by 6/20/2025 . Expert depositions shall be completed by 7/21/2025 . Exchange of rebuttal expert reports shall be completed by 9/5/2025 . All expert discovery shall be completed by 10/6/2025 , and certification of the completion of all discovery shall be filed on ECF by 10/20/2025 . The last date to take the first step in dispositive motion practice is 11/20/2025 , and must be done in accordance with the Individual Rules of the assigned District Judge. As stated on the record, this case will be referred to the EDNY Mediation Panel at the parties' request. Counsel shall exchange all relevant documents and records prior to mediation, if they have not done so already. The parties are directed to file their mediator selection on ECF by 2/20/2025 . Mediation shall be completed by 4/18/2025 . The parties are directed to file a joint status letter by 4/25/2025 , or within one week of the completion of mediation, whichever is sooner, providing an update as to the status of mediation and case status. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 2/6/2025. (Cisco Log #10:31-10:57.) (ERT)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 02/06 11:24 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediator selection shall be filed on ECF by 2/20/2025 . Mediation shall be completed by 4/18/2025 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 2/6/2025. (ERT)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Thu 02/06 12:37 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS: Mediation instructions for counsel are available[LINK:on the Court's website] . Counsel should select a mediator and schedule the initial mediation session with their chosen mediator. Once scheduled, counsel must file their selection using the [LINK:Selection of Mediator Form] . A list of EDNY Panel Mediators is available on the [LINK:Court's website] . EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with [LINK:EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)] . The Confidentiality Stipulation [LINK:in-person] or [LINK:remote] must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a [LINK:Mediation Report] to the ADR Department. (JR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
12 12 misc Case Management Statement Tue 01/28 3:29 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Worksheet (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/13 9:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Conference will be held on 2/6/2025 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. The parties are directed to call the number (571) 353-2301 . The meeting ID is 362861721 . The parties shall dial in five (5) minutes before the scheduled conference. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Case Management Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than 1/29/2025 . Should the parties wish to adopt a plan for discovery different from the structure in the worksheet, they may do so only if they file a letter explaining why such a plan is appropriate in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl on 12/13/2024. (KC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/12 4:51 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint by Richard Olivieri. (Ockert, Lily)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 12/05 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Leigh Harris Sutton on behalf of Richard Olivieri (aty to be noticed) (Sutton, Leigh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/04 12:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lily Anne Ockert on behalf of Richard Olivieri (aty to be noticed) (Ockert, Lily)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Affidavit of Service Tue 12/03 11:07 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Boris Gonzalez. Richard Olivieri served on 11/27/2024, answer due 12/18/2024., AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Richard Olivieri on 11/27/2024, filed by Boris Gonzalez. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
6 6 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 11/22 12:30 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 11/22 12:30 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 11/22 12:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Richard Olivieri. (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/22 10:46 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Boris Gonzalez (Brown, Robert) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/22/2024) (SDM). (SDM). Modified on 11/22/2024 (SDM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (11/22/2024) Proposed Summons
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/22 10:26 AM
NOTICE: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filled out correctly - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit a COMPLETED Civil Cover Sheet including the SECOND PAGE (Not the Instruction Page). This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 11/22 12:27 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Natasha C. Merle and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
2 2 11 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/19 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18507977 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Boris Gonzalez. (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Tue 11/19 11:33 AM
Missing Initiating Documents: Please file the Complaint and pay the Civil Filing Fee for the following case so that it may be processed. Initial Case Opening Documents Should be Filed at The Time a Case Number is generated (SDM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
1 1 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/14 11:12 AM
Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. by Boris Gonzalez (Brown, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Wed 11/13 9:57 PM
Please file the Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Proposed Summons and pay the Civil Filing Fee for the following case so that it may be processed. Initial Case Opening Documents Should be Filed at The Time a Case Number is generated (SDM)
Related: [-]