New York Eastern District Court
Judge:James R Cho
Case #: 1:24-cv-07866
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Changying Chen
Represented By
Neal J Mclaughlin
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Theresa Conduah
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chanqing Chen
Represented By
Neal J Mclaughlin
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Theresa Conduah
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1-50
Defendant
Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc.
Represented By
Neal J Mclaughlin
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Theresa Conduah
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant
AirsoftGI.com, LLC
Defendant
KTT International, Inc.
Represented By
Neal J Mclaughlin
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Theresa Conduah
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mayer Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Peter Scoolidge
Scoolidge Peters Russotti & Fox, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Modern Airsoft Pacific LLC
Plaintiff
Crye Precision LLC
Represented By
Justin Albano MacLean
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Giancarlo Scaccia
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Plaintiff
Lineweight, LLC
Represented By
Justin Albano MacLean
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Giancarlo Scaccia
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
47 47 service Certificate of Service Wed 04/23 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC re40 Request for Certificate of Default (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
46 46 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/21 11:34 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re45 Letter MOTION to Strike42 Reply in Support, filed by Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., Changying Chen, Chanqing Chen, KTT International, Inc.. (Conduah, Theresa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
45 45 motion Strike Mon 04/07 5:57 PM
Letter MOTION to Strike42 Reply in Support, by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
44 44 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 04/04 9:41 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Modern Airsoft Pacific LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Modern Airsoft Pacific LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP)
Related: [-]
43 43 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 04/04 9:38 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant AirsoftGI.com, LLC has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant AirsoftGI.com, LLC is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (JP)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Fri 04/04 3:48 PM
ORDER: The Court does not anticipate entertaining motions for default judgment against the non-appearing defendants at this time in light of the active defense of this action by the appearing, non-defaulting defendants. See LeMache v. Tunnel Taxi Mgmt., LLC, 354 F. Supp. 3d 149 (E.D.N.Y. 2019). The Court will set a deadline for moving for default judgment at the appropriate time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 4/4/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
42 42 respoth Reply in Support Wed 04/02 3:40 PM
REPLY in Support re33 Letter MOTION to Change Venue filed by Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., Changying Chen, Chanqing Chen, KTT International, Inc.. (Conduah, Theresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Of Changqing (Lily) Chen in Support of Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue
41 41 misc Request for Certificate of Default Wed 04/02 3:09 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Justin A. MacLean,
Att: 2 Proposed Certificate of Default,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
40 40 misc Request for Certificate of Default Wed 04/02 3:06 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Justin A. MacLean,
Att: 2 Proposed Certificate of Default,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
39 39 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/26 3:33 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re33 Letter MOTION to Change Venue filed by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 2025-03-25 Antone Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 2025-03-25 Thompson Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - MacLEan Declaration with Exhbiits
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/19 1:57 PM
ORDER granting38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court grants the motion for an extension of time to answer the complaint38 . Defendant Mayer Enterprises, LLC shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by 4/18/2025. The parties are encouraged to consent to the Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in this action.[LINK:MJ Consent Form] . Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. See Dkt. 11. Absent consent of all the parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, if defendant anticipates filing a dispositive motion in response to the complaint, by 4/18/2025, defendant must file a letter no longer than one page expressing its intent to file such a Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 3/19/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
38 38 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/18 12:38 PM
Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint,,,, by Mayer Enterprises, LLC. (Scoolidge, Peter)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/10 4:40 PM
ORDER granting37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. By 3/26/2025 , plaintiffs shall file their opposition, and by 4/2/2025 , defendants shall file a reply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 3/10/2025. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
37 37 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/07 8:45 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to33 Letter MOTION to Change Venue by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. (Scaccia, Giancarlo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
order Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 12:06 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re:36 Letter filed by Lineweight, LLC, Crye Precision LLC. The parties' briefing schedule is approved. By 3/12/2025 , plaintiffs shall file its opposition and by 3/19/2025 , defendants shall file a reply. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 3/6/2025. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
36 36 misc Letter Thu 02/27 10:45 PM
Letter re: Proposed Briefing Schedule for Motion to Transfer Venue by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC (Scaccia, Giancarlo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
35 35 16 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/26 6:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, by Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., Changying Chen, Chanqing Chen, KTT International, Inc.. (Conduah, Theresa)
Related: [-]
34 34 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/26 6:50 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., KTT International, Inc. (Conduah, Theresa)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Change Venue Wed 02/26 6:42 PM
Letter MOTION to Change Venue by Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., Changying Chen, Chanqing Chen, KTT International, Inc.. (Conduah, Theresa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Lily Chen Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Carol Chen Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Tang Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit D Proposed Order
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/26 11:21 AM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Mayer Enterprises, LLC. (Scoolidge, Peter)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 02/26 2:03 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Mayer Enterprises, LLC shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by 3/18/2025. As previously noted, absent consent of all the parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, if defendant anticipates filing a dispositive motion in response to the complaint, by 3/18/2025, defendant must file a letter no longer than one page expressing its intent to file such a Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 2/26/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/12 5:21 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint,,,, by Mayer Enterprises, LLC. (Scoolidge, Peter)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/12 5:53 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant Mayer Enterprises, LLC shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by 2/26/2025 . As previously noted, absent consent of all the parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, if defendant anticipates filing a dispositive motion in response to the complaint, by 2/26/2025 , defendant must file a letter no longer than one page expressing its intent to file such a Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 2/12/2025. (JDP)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/10 3:11 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,, by Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., Chanqing Chen, Changying Chen, KTT International, Inc.. (Mclaughlin, Neal)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/10 4:35 PM
ORDER: The Court grants the motion for an extension of time to answer the complaint26 . Defendants Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., Changying Chen, Chanqing Chen, and KTT International, Inc. shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by 2/26/2025. The parties are encouraged to consent to the Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in this action.[LINK:MJ Consent Form] . Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. See Dkt. 11. Absent consent of all the parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, if defendant anticipates filing a dispositive motion in response to the complaint, by 2/26/2025, defendant must file a letter no longer than one page expressing its intent to file such a Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 2/10/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/03 1:40 PM
ORDER: The Court grants the motion for an extension of time to answer the complaint29 . Defendant Mayer Enterprises, LLC shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by 2/12/2025. The parties are encouraged to consent to the Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in this action.[LINK:MJ Consent Form] . Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. See Dkt. 11. Absent consent of all the parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, if defendant anticipates filing a dispositive motion inresponse to the complaint, by 2/12/2025, defendant must file a letter no longer than one page expressing its intent to file such a Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 2/3/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 01/31 4:29 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint,,,, by Mayer Enterprises, LLC. (Scoolidge, Peter)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/31 4:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Scoolidge on behalf of Mayer Enterprises, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Scoolidge, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/17 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Giancarlo Scaccia on behalf of Lineweight, LLC, Crye Precision LLC (aty to be noticed) (Scaccia, Giancarlo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 01/16 9:50 AM
ORDER: The Court grants the motion for an extension of time to answer the complaint26 . Defendants Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., Changqing Chen, Changying Chen, and KTT International, Inc. shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint by 2/12/2025. The parties are encouraged to consent to the Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings in this action.[LINK:MJ Consent Form] . Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. See Dkt. 11. Absent consent of all the parties to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, if defendant anticipates filing a dispositive motion in response to the complaint, by 2/12/2025, defendant must file a letter no longer than one page expressing its intent to file such a Motion. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James R. Cho on 1/16/2025. (SGC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 01/15 6:50 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,,, by Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., Chanqing Chen, Changying Chen, KTT International, Inc.. (Mclaughlin, Neal)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 6:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Conduah on behalf of Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., Chanqing Chen, Changying Chen, KTT International, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Conduah, Theresa)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/15 6:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Neal J Mclaughlin on behalf of Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., Chanqing Chen, Changying Chen, KTT International, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Mclaughlin, Neal)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/23 10:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. Changying Chen served on 12/5/2024, answer due 12/26/2024. (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/23 10:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. Chanqing Chen served on 12/4/2024, answer due 12/25/2024. (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/23 10:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. Mayer Enterprises, LLC served on 12/9/2024, answer due 12/30/2024. (Ball, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/23 10:36 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. AirsoftGI.com, LLC served on 12/18/2024, answer due 1/8/2025. (Ball, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/27 5:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/27 5:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. KTT International, Inc. served on 11/22/2024, answer due 12/13/2024. (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/27 5:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. Modern Airsoft Pacific LLC served on 11/22/2024, answer due 12/13/2024. (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/27 5:01 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC. Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc. served on 11/22/2024, answer due 12/13/2024. (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
15 15 1 pgs notice Notice of Report on Copyright AO121 Fri 11/15 4:13 PM
Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (RC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F
14 14 service Summons Issued Fri 11/15 10:30 AM
Summons Issued as to Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc., AirsoftGI.com, LLC, Changying Chen, Chanqing Chen, KTT International, Inc., Mayer Enterprises, LLC, Modern Airsoft Pacific LLC. (SG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
13 13 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/14 4:08 PM
Proposed Summons. by Lineweight, LLC, Crye Precision LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
12 12 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 11/13 10:30 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Wed 11/13 10:29 PM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/13 10:28 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Cho. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Wed 11/13 10:30 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
10 10 notice Notice(Other) Tue 11/12 3:37 PM
NOTICE by Lineweight, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Crye Precision LLC re1 Complaint,,,, Notice of Filing or Determination of Action Regarding a Patent or A Trademark (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/12 3:30 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,, by Lineweight, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Crye Precision LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/12 3:29 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,, by Lineweight, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Crye Precision LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/12 3:27 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,, by Lineweight, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Crye Precision LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/12 3:26 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,, by Lineweight, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Crye Precision LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/12 3:22 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,, by Lineweight, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Crye Precision LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/12 3:20 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,, by Lineweight, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Crye Precision LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/12 3:19 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,, by Lineweight, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Crye Precision LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 11/12 3:17 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,,,, by Lineweight, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Crye Precision LLC (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 51 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/12 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT against Airsoft Wholesaler, Inc. dba Lancer Tactical, a California Corporation, AirsoftGI.com, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company, Changying Chen, Chanqing Chen, Does 1-50, KTT International, Inc. dba Airsoft Megastore, a California Corporation, Mayer Enterprises, LLC dba Airsoft Station, a Minnesota Limited Liability Company, Modern Airsoft Pacific LLC, a California Limited Liability Company filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18485390 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Crye Precision LLC, Lineweight, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (MacLean, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - MultiCam Registration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - MultiCam Black Registration,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - MultiCam Tropic Registration,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - MultiCam Arid Registration,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - MultiCam Trademarks,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Trademark Assignment,
Att: 7 Exhibit G- Lancer vs MultiCam Shape Comparison,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Rule 7.1 Statement