Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Darrin P Gayles
Case #: 1:24-cv-24454
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Bankruptcy Appeal from Judgment/Order
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Case in other court:USBC-MIA, 19-22744-LMI
Last checked: Friday Dec 27, 2024 3:34 AM EST
Appellant
Andrew T. Franzone
260 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10016
Appellee
Core Weave Inc
Represented By
Kristen McVeety
contact info
Appellee
Gregory Hersch
Represented By
Brad Axelrod
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Appellee
KapilaMukamal LLP
Represented By
Paul Joseph Battista
Venable LLP
contact info
Appellee
Soneet R. Kapila
Represented By
William Barry Blum
Genovese Joblove & Battista
contact info
Paul Joseph Battista
Venable LLP
contact info
Soneet Kapila
Kapila & Company
contact info
Appellee
Venable LLP
Represented By
Paul Joseph Battista
Venable LLP
contact info
Appellee
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
Represented By
Brad Axelrod
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Appellee
Dennis Hersch Estate
Represented By
Brad Axelrod
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Noticing Social Security General Counsel of SSA


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 10:03 AM
ORDER granting24 Agreed Motion to Supplement the Record on Appeal. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/15/2025. See attached document for full details. (hs01)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
24 24 6 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 04/11 2:27 PM
Agreed MOTION to Supplement the Record on Appeal by Soneet R. Kapila.(Blum, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 - Part 4
Thursday, April 03, 2025
23 23 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/03 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF 90 DAYS EXPIRING by Andrew T. Franzone. (caw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
22 22 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 04/02 12:23 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting21 Agreed Motion for Order Extending Time for Filing Trustee's Response Brief. The Trustee shall file the Response Brief on or before May 5, 2025. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/2/2025. (hs01)
Related: [-]
21 21 4 pgs motion Extension of Time Wed 04/02 9:22 AM
Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Response Brief re20 Appellant's Brief by Soneet R. Kapila. Responses due by 4/16/2025.(Blum, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Extension
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/02 2:42 PM
Reset Deadline per DE#22: Response due by 5/5/2025. (scn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
20 20 592 pgs appeal Appellants Brief Thu 03/06 3:45 PM
APPELLANT'S BRIEF by Andrew T. Franzone. (caw) Modified filing date on 3/6/2025 (caw). (Main Document 20 replaced on 3/7/2025) (rrs).
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
19 19 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Mon 02/24 9:40 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the email information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney William Barry Blum (pt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
18 18 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Fri 02/21 4:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney William Barry Blum (pt)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Fri 02/21 3:41 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Change of Email; by William Barry Blum (Blum, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
16 16 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/04 2:18 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting15 Agreed Joint Motion for Order Extending Time for Filing Appellant's Initial Brief. Appellant's Initial Brief shall be filed on or before March 5, 2025. That deadline shall not be extended except by a Court order entered before expiration of the deadline. By agreement, Appellant shall not seek, either pro se or through counsel, an extension of the above deadline set forth in this Order absent compelling, unexpected, exigent, and extraordinary circumstances demonstrated in a written motion filed at least one (1) day before such deadline. The filing of a motion for extension will not by itself extend any deadline. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/4/2025. (hs01)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
15 15 3 pgs motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/03 2:46 PM
Agreed Joint MOTION for Order Extending Time for Filing Appellant's Initial Brief by Soneet R. Kapila.(Blum, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 01/23 11:50 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. Appellant shall file his initial brief on or before February 3, 2025. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/23/2025. (hs01)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/10 5:12 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. The status conference on January 14, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 1/10/2025. (hs01)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
12 12 order Order Setting Status Conference Fri 12/27 3:41 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for January 14, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. in the Miami Division before Judge Darrin P. Gayles at the Wilkie D. Ferguson Jr. U.S. Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Courtroom 11-1, Miami, Florida. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 12/27/2024. (hs01)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
11 11 notice Notice 8018 and Notice to Attorney Thu 12/19 5:52 PM
Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 1/21/2025. (jc)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs misc Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court Thu 12/19 5:31 PM
Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Andrew T. Franzone [ [*NOTE: The Designation Contains Sealed Documents. The Clerk will NOT Transmit these Documents Until Such Time the Filer Complies with U.S. District Court's Local Rule 87.4(l)] (dcn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Appellant's List of Designated Items,
Att: 3 Appellant's Statement of Issues,
Att: 4 Appellant's Designated Items Part 1 [ECF #1 to ECF #299 from case 19-22744 ,
Att: 5 Appellant's Designated Items Part 2 [ECF #301 to ECF #499 from case 19-22744 ,
Att: 6 Appellant's Designated Items Part 3 [ECF #502 to ECF #686 from case 19-22744 ,
Att: 7 Appellant's Designated Items Part 4 [ECF #687 to ECF #890 from case 19-22744 ,
Att: 8 Appellant's Designated Items Part 5 [ECF #76 to ECF #139 from case 22-1017 ,
Att: 9 22-1017-LMI Docket Sheet
9 9 2 pgs order Order Reassigning/Transferring Case Thu 12/19 1:50 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Darrin P. Gayles for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 12/18/2024. Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
8 8 4 pgs notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Fri 12/13 11:33 AM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Soneet R. Kapila. Attorney William Barry Blum added to party Soneet R. Kapila(pty:e). (Blum, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Rule 8009 Statements in three cases
Monday, December 09, 2024
7 7 3 pgs motion Motion to Seal Wed 12/11 10:22 AM
MOTION for District Court to Accept Sealed Documents Based on Fed. R. Bank. P. 8009 by Andrew Franzone. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 3 pgs misc Bar Letter Wed 11/13 1:44 PM
Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Brad Axelrod and Kristen McVeety, mailing date November 13, 2024, (pt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
5 5 notice Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals Tue 11/12 5:31 PM
New Bankruptcy Appeal Case Filed - Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 11/12 5:17 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court Tue 11/12 3:44 PM
Bankruptcy Transmittal of Records to District Court re1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Andrew T. Franzone(nbo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet
1 1 7 pgs appeal Bankruptcy Appeal - CV - NO FEE Tue 11/12 3:42 PM
Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT Related [+], Bankruptcy Court case number 19-22744 LMI, filed by Andrew T. Franzone.(nbo)
Related: [-] ceived
SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (jc)
Related: [-]