Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Robert L Hinkle
Referred: Martin A Fitzpatrick
Case #: 4:24-cv-00455
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 5:33 AM EDT
Defendant
LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD
Represented By
TERRY JOSEPH HARMON
Sniffen & Spellman Pa - Tallahassee Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
D B
Represented By
STEWART LEE KARLIN
Stewart Lee Karlin Law Group - New Yory Ny
contact info
Plaintiff
K B
Represented By
STEWART LEE KARLIN
Stewart Lee Karlin Law Group - New Yory Ny
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/16 8:07 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - The deadline to file the Rule 26(f) report is 6/2/2025 . Absent good cause set out in the 26(f) report, the discovery deadline will be 11/19/2025 , and the trial will occur during the two-week period that begins on 3/2/2026 . Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 4/15/2025. (baf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TERRY JOSEPH HARMON on behalf of LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD (HARMON, TERRY)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 04/14 1:06 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re:18 Notice of Appearance. ***Please note, an Initial Scheduling Order (ISO) is needed at this time.*** (baf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 04/07 10:00 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD. LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD waiver sent on 4/2/2025, answer due 6/2/2025. (HARMON, TERRY)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/04 4:26 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by D B, K B. LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD waiver sent on 4/4/2025, answer due 6/3/2025. (KARLIN, STEWART)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
15 15 service Summons Issued Tue 03/18 3:28 PM
Summons Issued as to LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD. (baf)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/18 3:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, AMENDING THE CASE STYLE, AND ALLOWING PSEUDONYMS - Leave is granted to file the second amended complaint, ECF No. 12 . The second amended complaint is deemed filed as of March 18, 2025. The clerk must amend the docket entry to label ECF No. 12 as the second amended complaint. The case style is amended as shown in this order. Until otherwise ordered, the plaintiffs and the child they represent are given leave to proceed under pseudonyms. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 3/18/2025. (baf) (ECF No.12 amended to show as the second amended complaint. Plaintiff's updated and case style updated.)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 03/18 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Proposed Summons by DESHAN BAPTISTE, KALISHA BAPTISTE re12 Amended Complaint (KARLIN, STEWART)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/17 11:31 AM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, filed by DESHAN BAPTISTE, KALISHA BAPTISTE. (KARLIN, STEWART) Modified title on 3/18/2025 (baf)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by Magistrate Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 03/17 12:16 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re:12 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND. (baf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
3 3 Notice to Pro Se (baf)
Related: [-]
ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MARTIN A FITZPATRICK notified that action is needed Re:1 Complaint,2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MARTIN A FITZPATRICK. (baf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DESHAN BAPTISTE, KALISHA BAPTISTE. (baf)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against LEON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, filed by DESHAN BAPTISTE, KALISHA BAPTISTE. (baf) (No service copies provided.)
Related: [-]