Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Karoline Mehalchick
Case #: 3:24-cv-01940
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 6:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Phoenix Administrators, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Malak
Chariton Malak
contact info
Plaintiff
Sara Picard
Represented By
David V Dzara
Weir LLP
contact info
Walter Weir, Jr
Weir LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/30 12:16 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall file supplemental affidavits on or before Wednesday, May 14, 2025; Plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief on or before Wednesday, May 21, 2025; and Defendant shall file a supplemental brief on or before Wednesday, May 28, 2025. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 4/30/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
20 20 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/22 11:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/30/2025 09:00 AM before Honorable Karoline Mehalchick. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 4/22/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
19 19 misc Letter Mon 04/21 8:42 AM
Letter from Counsel for Sara Picard in accordance with the Court's Order of April 1, 2025 [Doc 18] .(Weir, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Sara Picard
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
18 18 1 pgs order Order Tue 04/01 1:17 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file an agreed-upon stipulation to relevant facts on or before April 22, 2025. Should the parties determine they will not file a joint stipulation of relevant facts, they should notify the Court as soon as possible. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 4/1/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/21 12:29 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 4/1/2025 11:00 AM before Honorable Karoline Mehalchick. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 3/21/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order Mon 02/03 3:00 PM
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall take limited discovery on the issues discussed during that call, to be completed on or before February 27, 2025, after which the parties will file an agreed-upon stipulation to relevant facts. After the parties docket the joint stipulation, the court will rule on the pending motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 2/3/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
order Verbal Scheduling Order Mon 01/27 2:58 PM
VERBAL SCHEDULING ORDER: (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) Telephone Status Conference set for 1/28/2025 08:30 AM before Honorable Karoline Mehalchick. (cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
12 12 respm Reply Brief Fri 01/10 3:00 PM
REPLY BRIEF re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sara Picard.(Weir, Walter)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
order Verbal Scheduling Order Wed 01/08 9:33 AM
VERBAL RESCHEDULING ORDER: (Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the order of the court or notice on the matter.) **CHANGE IN TIME ONLY** Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2025 08:30 AM before Honorable Karoline Mehalchick. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
11 11 respm Brief in Opposition (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Mon 12/30 12:31 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Phoenix Administrators, LLC.(Malak, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 12/30 12:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Phoenix Administrators, LLC.(Malak, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Mon 12/30 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Malak on behalf of Phoenix Administrators, LLC. (Malak, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
8 8 order Scheduling Order Tue 12/17 2:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 1/13/2025 10:00 AM before Honorable Karoline Mehalchick. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for the plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of this order on defendant. Upon receipt of the order, counsel for the defendant is directed once the order is served shall enter their appearance on the docket. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 12/17/2024. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/09 1:10 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Phoenix Administrators, LLC answer due 12/30/2024. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 12/9/2024 (cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/06 4:12 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Sara Picard.(Dzara, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 12/06 3:53 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed on December 6, 2024, Acknowledgement filed by Sara Picard. (Dzara, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
4 4 respm Brief in Support (Do not use for Summary Judgment Motions) Wed 11/13 11:53 AM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sara Picard.(Weir, Walter)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Wed 11/13 11:34 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Weir is asked to refile the memo of law in support of the motion is a Brief in Support to the motion for preliminary injunction. Brief in Support can be found under other responses and replies. (cw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
3 3 motion Preliminary Injunction Tue 11/12 7:00 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sara Picard.(Weir, Walter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Law in Support of Motion,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 11/12 3:25 PM
Summons Issued as to Phoenix Administrators, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (dj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 11/12 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Phoenix Administrators, LLC ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6813179), filed by Sara Picard.(dj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C