California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 3:24-cv-07914
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 2:34 AM PDT
Defendant
DUPI Underwriting Agencies, B.V. of Rotterdam Netherlands
Plaintiff
Captain Michael Severson
Represented By
John H. Cigavic, III
Basic Legal Services
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/14 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Michael Severson (Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
16 16 order Order Tue 04/01 11:32 AM
ORDER re ECF 15 : Plaintiff has indicated that the parties have settled. Defendant has not yet appeared. Plaintiff is ordered to file voluntary notice of dismissal or status report regarding the status of settlement by May 22, 2025. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on April 1, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Thompson, Trina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/31 4:09 PM
NOTICE by Michael Severson of Settlement (Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 03/07 3:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service served on Defendant on 2/27/25 and 3/5/25, filed by Michael Severson., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Severson (Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 02/14 10:20 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR FAILURE TO SERVE FOREIGN DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 2/13/2025. (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
12 12 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/13 4:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Trina L Thompson: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom webinar on 2/13/2025. Plaintiff to file proof of service no later than 3/10/2025. Order to Show Cause for Failure to Serve Foreign Defendant to be issued. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2025 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2025. Total Time in Court: 10 minutes. Court Reporter: Not reported. Plaintiff Attorney: John Cigavic. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER) (Date Filed: 2/13/2025)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
11 11 misc Case Management Statement Thu 02/06 1:21 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Michael Severson. (Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 11/21 12:29 PM
CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2025 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2025. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 11/21 10:49 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by The Clerk on 11/21/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
4 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael Severson (Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
2 2 Proposed Summons. (Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against DUPI UNDERWRITING AGENCIES, B.V., ROTTERDAM, NETHERLANDS ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20040895.). Filed by Michael Severson.(Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit to Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet