California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 4:24-cv-07914
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 11, 2025 2:37 AM PDT
Defendant
DUPI Underwriting Agencies, B.V. of Rotterdam Netherlands
Plaintiff
Captain Michael Severson
Represented By
John H. Cigavic, III
Basic Legal Services
contact info


Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 11/20 8:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 11/18 10:02 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Severson.. (Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 11/13 12:47 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2025 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 11/13 12:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Michael Severson. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 11/12 4:23 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 11/12 3:52 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael Severson (Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 11/12 3:51 PM
Proposed Summons. (Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/12 3:49 PM
COMPLAINT against DUPI UNDERWRITING AGENCIES, B.V., ROTTERDAM, NETHERLANDS ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20040895.). Filed by Michael Severson.(Cigavic, John H.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit to Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet