Arizona District Court
Judge:Alison S Bachus
Case #: 2:24-cv-03136
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 4:08 AM MST
Defendant
Ashe Ventures LLC
Represented By
John Howard Gray
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Isabella E Stoutenburg
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Estate of Prescott Ashe
Represented By
John Howard Gray
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Isabella E Stoutenburg
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Anne Kensok
Represented By
John Howard Gray
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Isabella E Stoutenburg
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
Charlotte Bonia
Represented By
Steven Charles Vondran
Law Offices Of Steven C. Vondran PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Designs by Charlie LLC
Represented By
Steven Charles Vondran
Law Offices Of Steven C. Vondran PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
50 50 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 04/29 3:28 PM
ORDER denying as moot Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc.35 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 4/29/25. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
49 49 misc Declaration Thu 04/24 4:14 PM
DECLARATION of Rob Stobo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint re:47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendants Ashe Ventures LLC, Estate of Prescott Ashe, Anne Kensok. (Gray, John)
Related: [-]
48 48 misc Declaration Thu 04/24 4:12 PM
DECLARATION of Anne Kensok in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plainitffs' First Amended Compaint re:47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendants Ashe Ventures LLC, Estate of Prescott Ashe, Anne Kensok.(Gray, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
47 47 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 04/24 4:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Ashe Ventures LLC, Estate of Prescott Ashe, Anne Kensok. (Gray, John)
Related: [-]