Arizona District Court
Judge:Alison S Bachus
Case #: 2:24-cv-03136
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Case Filed:Nov 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 6:45 AM MST
Defendant
Ashe Ventures LLC
Represented By
John Howard Gray
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Isabella E Stoutenburg
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Estate of Prescott Ashe
Represented By
John Howard Gray
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Isabella E Stoutenburg
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Anne Kensok
Represented By
John Howard Gray
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Isabella E Stoutenburg
Perkins Coie Llp - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Defendant
Chubb Corporation
Plaintiff
Charlotte Bonia
an Individual 273 W Los Alamos St.
Gilbert, AZ 85233
Represented By
Justin Fouts
Degnan Horne
contact info
Mark Walter Horne
Degnan Horne
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Designs by Charlie LLC
Terminated: 03/27/2025
a Delaware Corporation 723 W Los Alamos St.
Gilbert, AZ 85233
Represented By
Justin Fouts
Degnan Horne
contact info
Mark Walter Horne
Degnan Horne
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
50 50 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 04/29 3:28 PM
ORDER denying as moot Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Doc.35 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus on 4/29/25. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
49 49 misc Declaration Thu 04/24 4:14 PM
DECLARATION of Rob Stobo in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint re:47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendants Ashe Ventures LLC, Estate of Prescott Ashe, Anne Kensok. (Gray, John)
Related: [-]
48 48 misc Declaration Thu 04/24 4:12 PM
DECLARATION of Anne Kensok in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plainitffs' First Amended Compaint re:47 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendants Ashe Ventures LLC, Estate of Prescott Ashe, Anne Kensok.(Gray, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
47 47 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 04/24 4:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Ashe Ventures LLC, Estate of Prescott Ashe, Anne Kensok. (Gray, John)
Related: [-]