California Central District Court
Case #: 2:24-cv-09596
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 04, 2024
Terminated:Jan 02, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Dec 19, 2024 1:41 AM PST
Defendant
Paul Wallace
c o PO Box 2312
Pahoa, HI 96778
Plaintiff
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 02, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/03 2:55 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR REMAND by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sent a warning letter to Defendant(s)/Respondent(s) advising that failure to correct this deficiency within 30 days from the date of the warning letter would result in dismissal or remand of this case4 . More than 30 days have now passed, and the deficiency has not be corrected. This case is hereby ORDERED DISMISSED without prejudice. This case is dismissed rather than remanded because Defendant failed to provide the name of the state court in the Notice of Removal. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
4 4 notice Discrepancies with Filing of Complaint or Notice of Removal (CV-47) - optional html form Tue 11/12 3:27 PM
NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH FILING OF COMPLAINT OR NOTICE OF REMOVAL mailed to Defendant Paul Wallace. Upon filing of your complaint, the following discrepancy was found: You have not submitted the entire filing fee amount of $ 405. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you may request that the fee be waived. To do so, you must complete, sign, and return the enclose form, Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60), in its entirety. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date above, your action will be dismissed or remanded to state court, as appropriate. If your fee waiver request or payment is received within THIRTY DAYS, judges will be assigned to your case. You may return your fee waiver request or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
5 5 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 11/12 4:05 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Notice of Removal1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): No State Court Name and no information for Plaintiff such as an attorney or address, etc.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 11/12 3:25 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Notice of Removal1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Tue 11/12 3:23 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Notice of Removal1 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): No civil cover sheet. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 11/12 3:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from State Court [Name of State Court not noted], case number CC121000100. Filing fee $402 DUE, filed by Defendant Paul Wallace. (car)
Related: [-]