David Nathaniel Vasquez v. Jennifer Gerard et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | Brianna Fuller Mircheff |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-02354 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Nov 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday May 04, 2025 1:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Honorable Judge Jennifer Gerard
|
|
Defendant
Nicholas Kean
|
|
Defendant
District Attorney Sandra Kim
|
|
Plaintiff
David Nathaniel Vasquez
c/o 2805 Wagon Train Ln.
Diamond Bar, CA 91765 |
Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, November 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb: denying3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (sh) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff David Nathaniel Vasquez. (sh) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff David Nathaniel Vasquez, (sh) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Jennifer Gerard, Nicholas Kean, Sandra Kim Case assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff., filed by Plaintiff David Nathaniel Vasquez. (sh) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |