Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Case #: 9:24-cv-81419
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause46:1156 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Terminated:Feb 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Director, US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Application, LLC
Represented By
Jose D. Sosa
Convergent Litigation Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EB5AN DC and Carolinas Regional Center, LLC
Represented By
Jose D. Sosa
Convergent Litigation Associates, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EB5AN WA OR and Northern Plains Regional Center, LLC
Represented By
Jose D. Sosa
Convergent Litigation Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Fri 02/07 3:49 PM
ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 2/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Wed 02/05 1:00 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation) by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Application, LLC, EB5AN WA OR and Northern Plains Regional Center, LLC, EB5AN DC and Carolinas Regional Center, LLC(Sosa, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, January 23, 2025
6 6 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 01/23 3:42 PM
ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/22/2025. See attached document for full details. (gqa)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 18, 2025
5 5 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned EXECUTED AS TO USA DFTS Sat 01/18 1:22 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Application, LLC, EB5AN DC and Carolinas Regional Center, LLC, EB5AN WA OR and Northern Plains Regional Center, LLC. Director, US Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 1/16/2024, response/answer due 3/16/2024. (Sosa, Jose)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Tue 01/14 10:49 AM
Summons Issued as to Director, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cqs)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Tue 01/14 8:58 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Application, LLC, EB5AN DC and Carolinas Regional Center, LLC, EB5AN WA OR and Northern Plains Regional Center, LLC re1 Complaint, filed by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Application, LLC, EB5AN WA OR and Northern Plains Regional Center, LLC, EB5AN DC and Carolinas Regional Center, LLC (Sosa, Jose)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 11/13 10:03 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/13 9:03 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17979151, filed by EB5 Affiliate Network Regional Center Application, LLC, EB5AN DC and Carolinas Regional Center, LLC, EB5AN WA OR and Northern Plains Regional Center, LLC.(Sosa, Jose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet