California Central District Court
Judge:David T Bristow
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:24-cv-02410
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Case in other court:San Bernadino County Superior Court, CIVSB2427258
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 1:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Exel, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher J Boman
Fisher And Phillips LLP
contact info
Harrison Zator
Fisher And Phillips LLP
contact info
Boris Sorsher
Fisher And Phillips LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sergio Nava
Represented By
Ashley Silva-Guzman
Jaurigue Law Group
contact info
S Sean Shahabi
Jaurigue Law Group
contact info
Kelley Bond
Jaurigue Law Group
contact info
Michael J Jaurigue
Jaurigue Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
17 17 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 05/14 9:12 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (rma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/26 5:55 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2026 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. Jury Trial set for 4/6/2026 at 8:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 01/29 12:34 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow: The Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2025 1:30 pm, is hereby VACATED. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program Mon 01/27 1:42 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 18-11 is approved by Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 5:24-cv-02410-DTB. (ap)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Lodging Tue 01/21 12:26 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Statement of Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form4(Zator, Harrison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Consent to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge
Friday, January 17, 2025
12 12 notice Appearance Fri 01/17 5:06 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael J Jaurigue on behalf of Plaintiff Sergio Nava (Jaurigue, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 01/17 3:00 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4, filed by Defendant Exel, Inc...(Boman, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Joint Rule 26(f) Report
Thursday, December 05, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 12/05 3:01 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2025 at 01:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/22 3:27 PM
Notice filed by Defendant Exel, Inc.. OF JUDGE SUNSHINE S. SYKES CIVIL STANDING ORDER(Zator, Harrison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Standing Order
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 11/22 12:31 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/20 6:08 PM
Notice filed by Defendant Exel, Inc.. OF COURT-ISSUED NOTICES AND ORDERS(Zator, Harrison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Assignment of District Judge,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Hon. Sykes Civil Standing Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Hon. Sykes Civil Standing Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Hon. Sykes Order Setting Scheduling Conference
Monday, November 18, 2024
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 11/18 6:36 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 11/18 6:35 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 11/18 6:35 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 11/13 9:38 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Exel Inc. dba DHL Supply Chain (USA), identifying DPWN Holdings (USA), Inc. (Zator, Harrison)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 11/13 9:36 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Exel Inc. dba DHL Supply Chain (USA). (Zator, Harrison)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 11/13 9:29 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernadino, case number CIVSB2427258 Receipt No: ACACDC-38569141 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Exel Inc. dba DHL Supply Chain (USA). (Attorney Harrison Zator added to party Exel Inc. dba DHL Supply Chain (USA)(pty:dft))(Zator, Harrison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Harrison Zator,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint Package,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Answer,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Notice to Superior Court,
Att: 5 Declaration of Jason Cellier,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4 - Earning Statement
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 11/18 6:38 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Exel, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Sergio Nava. (FILED IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/6/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 11/18 6:41 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Exel, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh)
Related: [-]