Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:John A Gibney, Jr
Case #: 3:24-cv-00804
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 4:55 AM EST
Defendant
Antoinette Irving
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-20
Plaintiff
Monique Trent
Administrator of the Estate of Jesse Trent, Deceased Brooks & Baez 1202 St. Paul St.
Richmond, VA 23230
Represented By
Jesse Baez
Brooks & Baez
contact info
Erik David Baines
Brooks & Baez
contact info
Thomas Brooks
Brooks & Baez
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, April 04, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 04/04 9:40 AM
Set Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 6/3/2025 at 09:30 AM in Richmond Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. (jsau, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
24 24 6 pgs order Order Thu 04/03 1:47 PM
ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE- The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on June 3, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 4/3/2025. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
23 23 8 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 03/19 3:47 PM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 3/6/2025. (jpow, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/14 2:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Antoinette Irving.(Edwards, Daniel-Lester)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
21 21 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 12:10 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER - Jury Trial set for 9/16-18/2025 at 09:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6000 before District Judge John A. Gibney Jr. The Court has referred this case to United States Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell for settlement. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS AND DEADLINES. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 3/6/2025. (jpow, )
Related: [-]
20 20 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 03/06 11:42 AM
Memorandum in Support re19 Consent MOTION for Protective Order filed by Antoinette Irving. (Adams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Protective Order Thu 03/06 11:37 AM
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Antoinette Irving.(Adams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/06 12:15 PM
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell for settlement purposes. (jpow, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Wed 03/05 9:40 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/5/2025. (jpow, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/03 5:00 PM
ORDER - Because the Complaint contains enough factual allegations to support the claims against Irving in her individual capacity, the Court DENIES the motion to dismiss in part. (ECF No.11 .) But Eleventh Amendment immunity protects Irving from being sued in her official capacity for monetary relief, see Bland v. Roberts, 730 F.3d 368, 390 (4th Cir. 2013), and Trent does not contest that the Eleventh Amendment bars her monetary claims against Irving in her official capacity. The Court, therefore, will GRANT the motion to dismiss in part and dismiss Trents claims stated in Counts I, II, IV, V, VI, and VII of the Complaint insofar as Trent sues Irving in her official capacity for monetary relief' (ECF No.11 .) It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 3/3/2024. (ewat, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/19 12:52 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Antoinette Irving. (Adams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
16 16 28 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition Thu 02/13 10:31 AM
Memorandum in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Monique Trent. (Baez, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/12 11:00 AM
STANDING ORDER - The Court authorizes all attorneys in this case to bring in their personal electronic devices to any hearing held before the undersigned in this case. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 1/23/2024. (jpow, )
Related: [-]
14 14 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/12 11:00 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2025 at 09:10 AM before District Judge John A. Gibney Jr. Counsel are directed to report to Courtroom 6000. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 2/12/2025. (jpow, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Unseal Document Fri 01/31 12:06 PM
ORDER that Defendant's Consent Motion to Unseal Exhibit 1 to the Complaint is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Exhibit 1 of Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No.1 -1) is hereby unsealed and placed on the public record. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to redact any personal identifying information of the plaintiff, such as his social security number or date of birth. Let the Clerk send a copy of this Order to all counsel of record. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 01/31/2025. (Kski, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
12 12 29 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 01/29 5:44 PM
Memorandum in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Antoinette Irving. (Edwards, Daniel-Lester)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 01/29 4:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Antoinette Irving.(Edwards, Daniel-Lester)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 3 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Wed 01/29 4:54 PM
Memorandum in Support re9 Consent MOTION to Unseal Document Exhibit 1 of the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) filed by Antoinette Irving. (Edwards, Daniel-Lester)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Unseal Document Wed 01/29 4:51 PM
Consent MOTION to Unseal Document Exhibit 1 of the Complaint (ECF No. 1-1) by Antoinette Irving.(Edwards, Daniel-Lester)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel-Lester Edwards on behalf of Antoinette Irving (Edwards, Daniel-Lester)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 4:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Woodul Tunner on behalf of Antoinette Irving (Tunner, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Willer Adams on behalf of Antoinette Irving (Adams, Rachel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 12/03 1:17 PM
Summons Issued as to Antoinette Irving, John Doe Defendants 1-20. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplex copies of the Electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention. Electronically file the summons return using the filing events Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. Please ensure that the original summons page signed by the clerk is the first document to appear when filing the return of service. (adun, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 11/29 2:50 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Monique Trent. (Baez, Jesse)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Fri 11/29 2:39 PM
Proposed Summons John Doe Deputies by Monique Trent (Baez, Jesse)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Fri 11/29 2:38 PM
Proposed Summons by Monique Trent (Baez, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/13 12:40 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9845187.), filed by Monique Trent.(Baez, Jesse) (Main Document 1 replaced on 11/13/2024) (ewat, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
utility Initial Case Assignment Wed 11/13 4:21 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (adun, )
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Correction Wed 11/13 4:26 PM
Notice of Correction: Attorney reminded to file a Civil Case Cover sheet and Proposed Summons as soon as possible. Exhibit 1 in ECF1 pertains to medical records. Attorney reminded to follow the policy and procedures for filing documents under seal. All medical information should be filed under seal. (adun, )
Related: [-]