California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mc-01934
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Defendant
Guangdong Enaiter Electrical Appliance Co. Ltd.
Plaintiff
NuWave, LLC

GPO Mar 10 2025
ORDER denying 10 Motion to Stay Examination of Third Party Mirama Enterprises. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 3/07/2025. (jpp)

Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, April 24, 2025
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 04/24 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NuWave, LLC FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (Moon, James)(sjt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 04/08 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address by James H. Moon (Moon, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/17 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF TAKING MIRAMA'S THIRD PARTY EXAMINATION OFF CALENDAR by NuWave, LLC re8 Order on Motion to Continue, (Moon, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
18 18 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 03/10 8:57 AM
ORDER denying10 Motion to Stay Examination of Third Party Mirama Enterprises. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 3/07/2025. (jpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
17 17 service Certificate of Service Fri 03/07 4:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NuWave, LLC re8 Order on Motion to Continue, (Moon, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Certificate of Service Fri 03/07 4:36 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NuWave, LLC re8 Order on Motion to Continue, (Moon, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 02/26 10:25 PM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Neal H. Levin, re14 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief District Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/26/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/26 11:35 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Levin, Neal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/25 3:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Stay Third-Party Examination to Discover Assets filed by NuWave, LLC. (Moon, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
12 12 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Wed 02/19 11:59 AM
ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Neal H. Levin, re11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief District Judge Cynthia Bashant on 2/19/2025.(exs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
11 11 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/12 8:41 AM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19596633.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Levin, Neal)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
10 10 motion Stay Tue 02/11 7:30 PM
MOTION to Stay Third-Party Examination to Discover Assets by Guangdong Enaiter Electrical Appliance Co. Ltd..(Tjoe, Ivan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Motion for Reconsideration
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/11 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan L Tjoe on behalf of Guangdong Enaiter Electrical Appliance Co. Ltd. (Tjoe, Ivan)Attorney Ivan L Tjoe added to party Guangdong Enaiter Electrical Appliance Co. Ltd.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
8 8 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 02/07 10:26 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to reset Examination of Third Party Mirama Enterprises, Inc. to 3/19/2025. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 3/19/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 2/07/2025. (jpp)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Continue Fri 02/07 9:41 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Examination of Third Party Mirama Enterprises, Inc. by NuWave, LLC.(Moon, James) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue Third Party Examination
Friday, January 31, 2025
6 6 service Certificate of Service Fri 01/31 3:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NuWave, LLC re5 Order, Set Hearings (Moon, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
5 5 12 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/08 1:56 PM
ORDER granting4 Application for appearance and examination of Third Party. Judgment Debtor Exam set for 2/12/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 1/08/2025.(jpp)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
4 4 misc Request for Judgment Debtor Exam Fri 12/06 4:11 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAM before Judge Hon. Michelle M. Pettit filed by Plaintiff NuWave, LLC.(Moon, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Order re Pro Hac Vice Application Tue 11/26 11:54 AM
ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Nicholas S. Lee, re2 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief District Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/26/2024.(exs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
2 2 notice Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/21 12:39 PM
Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 224 receipt number ACASDC-19372289.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lee, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
1 1 cmp Misc Case - Registration of Judgment Wed 11/13 10:50 AM
MISCELLANEOUS CASE - Registration of Judgment from the Northern District of Illinois, Eastern Division. ( Filing fee $ 52 receipt number ACASDC-19344721.), filed by NuWave, LLC. (jpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment