New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-08599
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331fl Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
IMCMV Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Christine Lee Hogan
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, Llp.
contact info
Defendant
Proper Hospitality Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Helen Anne Rella
Wilk Auslander
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Espinales
Represented By
Daniel Alan Tannenbaum
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/22 11:24 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/22/2025) Proper Hospitality Solutions, LLC answer due 5/21/2025 (ar)
Related: [-]
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Tue 04/22 12:33 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 5/22/2025.(sge)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
14 14 order Mediation Referral Order for Cases Filed Under the Fair Labor Standards Act Mon 04/21 9:48 AM
MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 5/5/2025. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 12/10/2019) (rpr)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/21 9:47 AM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Helen A. Rella dated April 21, 2025. Document filed by Proper Hospitality Solutions, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] lla, Helen
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Helen Anne Rella on behalf of Proper Hospitality Solutions, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] lla, Helen
Thursday, April 17, 2025
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/17 8:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by IMCMV Holdings, Inc...(Hogan, Christine)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/17 8:10 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent IMCMV Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent International Meal Company Alimentacao, S.A. for IMCMV Holdings, Inc.. Document filed by IMCMV Holdings, Inc...(Hogan, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 03/12 8:59 AM
ORDER granting8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. SO ORDERED. IMCMV Holdings, Inc. answer due 4/17/2025. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/11/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/11 4:29 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Christine Hogan dated March 11, 2025. Document filed by IMCMV Holdings, Inc...(Hogan, Christine)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/11 4:12 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Lee Hogan on behalf of IMCMV Holdings, Inc...(Hogan, Christine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Thu 03/06 1:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. IMCMV Holdings, Inc. served on 2/11/2025, answer due 3/4/2025; Proper Hospitality Solutions, LLC served on 2/4/2025, answer due 2/25/2025. Service was accepted by David Crabtree, Vice President; Donna "Doe", Authorized Employee. Document filed by Katherine Espinales..(Tannenbaum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 03/04 3:55 PM
ORDER, Plaintiff is ORDERED to serve Defendants by March 11, 2025 or advise the Court in a letter by that date as to why it is unable to serve the Complaint. SO ORDERED. ( Service due by 3/11/2025.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 3/4/25) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 01/17 2:05 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMCMV Holdings, Inc., Proper Hospitality Solutions, LLC..(pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 01/17 1:46 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Alan Tannenbaum. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Katherine Espinels. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 01/16 11:32 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IMCMV Holdings, Inc., Proper Hospitality Solutions, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Katherine Espinels..(Tannenbaum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 11/14 1:12 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Alan Tannenbaum. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Katherine Espirales. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 11/14 1:15 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 11/14 1:15 PM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 11/14 1:16 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11/13 1:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Tannenbaum, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/13 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT against IMCMV Holdings, Inc., Proper Hospitality Solutions, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30178443)Document filed by Katherine Espirales..(Tannenbaum, Daniel)
Related: [-]