Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-24343

Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Katherine M Perhach
Case #: 2:24-ap-02156
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Terminated:Jan 16, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Premere Maurice Benson
6245 W. Court Avenue
Milwaukee, WI 53223
Represented By
Brent J. Berning
Berning Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development
201 E. Washington Ave. P.O. Box 8942
Madison, WI 53708
Represented By
Brett A. Balinsky
Wisconsin Department Of Workforce Development
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Saturday, January 18, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/18 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 01/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order on Stipulation
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 01/18 11:40 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 01/18/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Judgment
Thursday, January 16, 2025
11 11 court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/16 12:11 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2156 Closed. (jah, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 01/16 12:08 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-2156 Order on Stipulation. (jah, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Judgment Thu 01/16 12:07 PM
Entry of Judgment. (jah, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 01/16 12:04 PM
Order for Judgment Related [+]. (jah, Deputy Clerk) (Signed: 01/16/2025)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
7 7 misc Proposed Order Tue 01/14 12:59 PM
Proposed Order (Agreed to by the Parties) RE:6 - Stipulation filed by Attorney Brett A. Balinsky of Wisconsin Department of Workforce Development on behalf of State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development. (Balinsky, Brett)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 01/14 12:57 PM
Stipulation By State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development and Premere Maurice Benson Filed by State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development Related [+] (Balinsky, Brett)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development
Friday, December 20, 2024
5 5 motion Default Judgment Fri 12/20 2:03 PM
Motion for Default Judgment and Affidavit in Support of Motion with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development Objections due by 1/13/2025. (Balinsky, Brett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 11/14 1:23 PM
Summons Service Executed on Atty. Brent J. Berning and Premere Maurice Benson 11/14/2024 Related [+]
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,3 Electronic Summons Issued (Balinsky, Brett)
3 3 court Electronic Summons Issued Thu 11/14 12:37 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7004 and file a certificate of service with the Court. Answer due by 12/16/2024. United States and its officers and agencies answer due by 12/19/2024. (ecb, Law Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Tue 11/12 4:17 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-02156 kmp] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A23150380. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+] . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/12 4:14 PM
Adversary case 24-02156 Complaint by State of Wisconsin, Department of Workforce Development (attorney Brett A. Balinsky) against Premere Maurice Benson. Fee Amount $350 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud))(Balinsky, Brett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B