Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tiffany M Cartwright
Case #: 3:24-cv-05942
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Fair Credit Reporting
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Terminated:Mar 10, 2025
Case in other court:Thurston County District Court, 37971
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 1:38 AM PDT
Defendant
Pendrick Capital Partners LLC
Represented By
Ryan W Vollans
Williams Kastner (sea)
contact info
Tuan V. Uong
Sessions Israel & Shartle Llp (ca)
contact info
Defendant
Pendrick Capital Partners Asset Management LLC
Represented By
Ryan W Vollans
Williams Kastner (sea)
contact info
Tuan V. Uong
Sessions Israel & Shartle Llp (ca)
contact info
Plaintiff
Janice Hennessey
E-Filing/Service 421 Broadway #533
SAN DIEGO, CA 92101


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
28 28 4 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 03/10 3:22 PM
ORDER re27 Notice of Settlement. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Stipulated Notice of Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Pendrick Capital Partners LLC and Pendrick Capital Partners Asset Management LLC is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MDH)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 03/10 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Dismissal by Plaintiff Janice Hennessey (Hennessey, Janice)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
26 26 12 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/03 3:45 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part18 Motion to Dismiss. Ms. Hennessey's request for leave to amend is GRANTED. Ms. Hennessey may file an amended complaint no later than March 24, 2025.The Clerk is directed to send uncertified copies of this Order to all counsel of record and to any party appearing pro se at said party's last known address. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright.(MDH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
25 25 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Wed 02/26 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name Filed by Plaintiff Janice Hennessey. Plaintiff's address updated (Hennessey, Janice) Modified address on 2/26/2025 (MDH)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/26 11:17 AM
ORDER re23 Application,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Tuan V. Uong for Defendants Pendrick Capital Partners Asset Management LLC, and Pendrick Capital Partners LLC, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
utility Notice to PHV and Local Counsel Unable to Process Application Wed 02/26 8:20 AM
Notice-Other,22 by attorney Tuan Van Uong will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via[LINK:Manage My Account] on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the[LINK:Pro Hac Vice Application Guide] for detailed instructions. Please contact the Attorney Admissions Clerk at 206-370-8400 or[LINK:WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov] with additional questions. (Ad hoc Attorney Tuan Van Uong) (HH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
23 23 misc Application Wed 02/26 11:16 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Tuan Van Uong FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendants Pendrick Capital Partners LLC, Pendrick Capital Partners Asset Management LLC. Receipt No. AWAWDC-8854057 Related [+] (HH)
Related: [-] -docketed for clerical purposes
22 22 notice Notice-Other Mon 02/24 2:38 PM
NOTICE Pro Hac Vice Application (Payment already made) ; filed by Defendants Pendrick Capital Partners LLC, Pendrick Capital Partners Asset Management LLC. (Vollans, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
21 21 order TMC Minute Order Setting Trial and Pretrial Dates (FORM) Thu 02/20 9:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. *1 DAY* Jury Trial is set for 3/23/2026 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom C before District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. Joinder of Parties due by 5/21/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 6/2/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/25/2025, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 9/24/2025, Discovery Motions due by 9/24/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 10/24/2025, Discovery completed by 10/24/2025, Dispositive motions due by 11/24/2025, Motions in Limine due by 2/17/2026, Pretrial Order due by 3/2/2026, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 3/2/2026, Agreed Neutral Statement of the Case due by 3/2/2026, Deposition Designations due by 3/2/2026, Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2026 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom C before District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. The court will not provide remote public access for this hearing. (MET)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Chambers Procedures
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
20 20 misc Joint Status Report Tue 02/18 12:34 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 1. Filed by Plaintiff Janice Hennessey.(Hennessey, Janice)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
19 19 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/30 10:49 AM
RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Janice Hennessey, to18 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint .(Hennessey, Janice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 4
Monday, December 09, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss Mon 12/09 4:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint , filed by All Defendants. Noting Date 1/6/2025, (Vollans, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/25 6:25 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Janice Hennessey.(Hennessey, Janice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5
16 16 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 11/25 4:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file the second amended complaint15 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is directed to file a clean copy of her second amended complaint within 14 days of this order. Authorized by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MW)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 24, 2024
15 15 motion Leave to File Document Sun 11/24 12:51 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint , filed by Plaintiff Janice Hennessey. Noting Date 11/25/2024, (Hennessey, Janice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint [PROPOSED] SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 21, 2024
14 14 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 11/21 2:48 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Pendrick Capital Partners Asset Management LLC. (Vollans, Ryan)
Related: [-]
13 13 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Thu 11/21 2:30 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Pendrick Capital Partners LLC. (Vollans, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
12 12 order TMC - Discovery, Depositions, and JSR Order (FORM) Mon 11/18 9:27 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 2/3/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/10/2025, Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2025. (MET)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
11 11 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Thu 11/14 10:52 AM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Thurston County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted federal court jury demand on file (MW)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice to Withdraw Pending Motion Thu 11/14 8:41 AM
NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re3 MOTION to Remand Due to Procedural Deficiencies in Removal ; by Plaintiff Janice Hennessey. (Hennessey, Janice)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Compliance Thu 11/14 8:38 AM
NOTICE of Compliance regarding Attorney Ryan Vollans with FRCP and Local Rules by Plaintiff Janice Hennessey. (Hennessey, Janice)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 11/14 10:41 AM
District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright added. (MW)
Related: [-]
utility Disclosure Statement - Notice of Deadlines Thu 11/14 10:52 AM
NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Pendrick Capital Partners LLC and Pendrick Capital Partners Asset Management LLC must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/21/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/13 7:09 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND filed by Janice Hennessey.(Hennessey, Janice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5
6 6 misc Jury Demand Wed 11/13 5:26 PM
DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Janice Hennessey (Hennessey, Janice)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice-Other Wed 11/13 3:56 PM
NOTICE Joinder and Consent to Removal re1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendant Pendrick Capital Partners Asset Management, LLC. (Vollans, Ryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/13 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan W Vollans on behalf of Defendant Pendrick Capital Partners Asset Management, LLC. (Vollans, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Remand Wed 11/13 3:21 PM
MOTION to Remand Due to Procedural Deficiencies in Removal , filed by Plaintiff Janice Hennessey. Noting Date 12/12/2024, (Hennessey, Janice)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re Pro Se Registration Wed 11/13 2:53 PM
NOTICE: Plaintiff Janice Hennessey has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 11/13 12:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Thurston County District Court, case number 37971; Related [+] filed by Pendrick Capital Partners Asset Management, LLC, Pendrick Capital Partners LLC.(Vollans, Ryan)
Related: [-] ceipt # BWAWDC-8716659
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet