New Mexico District Court
Judge:William P Johnson
Referred: Jerry H Ritter
Case #: 2:24-cv-01151
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Nov 12, 2024
Terminated:Jan 06, 2025
Case in other court:Fifth Judicial District Court, D-503-CV-24-00729
Last checked: Friday Dec 27, 2024 1:43 AM MST
Defendant
Jozam Express LLC
Represented By
Richard M Padilla
contact info
Defendant
Albert Lopez
Represented By
Richard M Padilla
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Shehorne
Represented By
Lannie Todd Kelly
The Carlson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, February 06, 2025
NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 6. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
20 20 Letter by Fifth Judicial District Court confirming remand of this case. (cmm)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
19 19 Letter to Fifth Judicial District Court by USDC Clerk remanding back to Court. (cmm)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs ORDER by Chief District Judge William P. Johnson granting10 Motion to Remand. (cmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Chief United States District Judge William P. Johnson as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Chief United States Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
16 16 RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION to Remand filed by Albert Lopez, Jozam Express LLC. (Padilla, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
13 13 Joint Status Report Amended by Albert Lopez, Jozam Express LLC (Padilla, Richard)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Minutes for telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter on 12/18/2024: Attorney Cambry Bristow, standing in for Attorney Todd Kelly, appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Richard Padilla appeared for Defendants. The parties noted that a motion to remand is pending and awaiting full briefing. The Court discussed the procedure for consent to a presiding magistrate judge and the December 31, 2024 , deadline to file notices of consent or non-consent pursuant to Rule 73. No party objected to the Court finding good cause to delay entry of a scheduling order pending resolution of the motion to remand. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jm)
Related: [-]
ORDER FINDING good cause to delay issuance of Rule 16 scheduling order by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. Plaintiff's10 Motion to Remand would eliminate or alter the need for discovery if granted. Per Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), there is good cause to delay issuance of a scheduling order in this case until the motion is resolved. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 14 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kls)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
11 11 Joint Status Report by Albert Lopez, Jozam Express LLC (Padilla, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
10 10 MOTION to Remand by Michael Shehorne. (Kelly, Todd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
9 9 NOTICE by Albert Lopez, Jozam Express LLC of Amended Removal (Padilla, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albert Lopez Initial Disclosures (Padilla, Richard)
Related: [-]
7 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jozam Express LLC Initial Disclosures (Padilla, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Albert Lopez, Jozam Express LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Padilla, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
INSTRUCTIONS by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter for telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for December 18, 2024 , at 9:00 AM MT . To join the proceedings, parties shall call my toll-free line at (855) 244-8681 and enter the access code 2300 319 9611# . [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
4 4 2 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. A joint status report, initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures, and notices of consent or non-consent to proceed before a magistrate judge due by December 11, 2024 . Consenting to proceed before a magistrate judge is strictly voluntary, and the parties are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences . The Court further sets a telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter for December 18, 2024 , at 9:00 AM MT . The Court shall issue instructions to join the proceedings closer to the date of the hearing. (jm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
3 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jozam Express LLC, Albert Lopez. (Padilla, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
2 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
Related: [-]
Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (eh)
Related: [-]
United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (eh)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Albert Lopez from Fifth Judicial District Court, case number D-503-CV-2024-00729. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Albert Lopez.(Padilla, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9634539 re1 Notice of Removal filed by Albert Lopez (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Padilla, Richard)
Related: [-]