Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12609

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Craig T Goldblatt
Case #: 1:24-bk-12610
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
PetroQuest Energy, L.L.C.
PO Box 51205
Lafayette, LA 70505-1205
Represented By
Patrick J. Reilley
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Friday, January 03, 2025
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 01/03 6:28 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by PetroQuest Energy, L.L.C.. (Hartlipp, Melissa)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Fri 01/03 6:26 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by PetroQuest Energy, L.L.C.. (Hartlipp, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Fri 11/15 8:54 PM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Cases and (II) Waiving Certain Requirements of Bankruptcy Rule 2002(n). An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of PetroQuest Energy, Inc., Case No. 24-12609 (CTG), for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 24-12609 (CTG) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 11/15/2024. (NAB) (NAB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Wed 11/13 4:52 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-12610 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11890934, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 11/13 4:44 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by PetroQuest Energy, L.L.C.. Related [+]
Related: [-] illey, Patrick
court Case Assigned Wed 11/13 5:02 PM
Judge Craig T Goldblatt added to case (SH)
Related: [-]