Washington Western District Court
Judge:John C Coughenour
Case #: 2:24-cv-01871
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Case in other court:King County Superior Court, unfiled
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 1:20 AM PST
Defendant
American Expediting Logistics LLC
Represented By
Joseph Q Ridgeway
Lane Powell Pc (sea)
contact info
Priya Bhoplay Vivian
Lane Powell Pc (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
David Hamilton
Represented By
Andrew David Shafer
Andrew D Shafer
contact info
Plaintiff
DEI Holdings Inc
Represented By
Andrew David Shafer
Andrew D Shafer
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation Wed 02/19 7:12 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal per FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by parties (Shafer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 02/19 12:07 PM
***Civil Case Terminated, pursuant to FRCP 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), per the filing of Parties'17 Stipulation of Dismissal. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 12/31 11:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the parties' stipulation of stay and notice of settlement (Dkt. No.15 ). Accordingly, all deadlines are STRICKEN. The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint status report or stipulation of dismissal within sixty (60) days of this Order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
15 15 motion Stipulated Motion Mon 12/30 4:12 PM
Stipulated MOTION Staying Proceeding Pending Settlement , filed by All Parties. Noting Date 12/31/2024, (Shafer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Change of Address/Change of Name Mon 12/23 7:58 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Priya Bhoplay Vivian. Filed by Defendant American Expediting Logistics LLC. (Vivian, Priya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/10 2:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint; by American Expediting Logistics LLC.(Vivian, Priya)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 11/19 4:22 PM
ORDER granting Parties'9 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint. The new deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is 12/10/2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KRA)
Related: [-]
11 11 order JCC-Interim JSR Minute Order Tue 11/19 4:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. In addition to the requirements articulated in FRCP 26(f)(3), the Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation. The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/31/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/7/2025, Joint Status Report due by 1/14/2025. (KMP)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Discovery and Depositions Order (FORM) Tue 11/19 4:21 PM
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 11/19 3:38 PM
Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint , filed by Defendant American Expediting Logistics LLC. Noting Date 11/19/2024, (Ridgeway, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 15, 2024
8 8 utility Judge Assignment Letter (Removal & Transfer cases only) Fri 11/15 4:06 PM
LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MIH)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 11/15 4:03 PM
U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (MIH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
7 7 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 11/13 4:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by DEI Holdings, Inc.. (Shafer, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice-Other Wed 11/13 2:41 PM
NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal to Federal Court ; filed by Defendant American Expediting Logistics, LLC. (Vivian, Priya)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 11/13 2:36 PM
CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent AC Amex Investors LLC, Corporate Parent AEA Investors Small Business Fund III LP, Other Affiliate AMEX Holding III Corporation, Other Affiliate AMEX Holding II Corporation, Other Affiliate AMEX Holding I Corporation for American Expediting Logistics, LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by American Expediting Logistics, LLC. (Vivian, Priya)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration (non motion) Wed 11/13 2:31 PM
DECLARATION of Marie Meisenbach Graul re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant American Expediting Logistics, LLC (Vivian, Priya)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration (non motion) Wed 11/13 2:30 PM
DECLARATION of Priya B. Vivian re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant American Expediting Logistics, LLC (Vivian, Priya)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Declaration (non motion) Wed 11/13 2:28 PM
DECLARATION of Michael J. Montgomery re1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant American Expediting Logistics, LLC (Vivian, Priya)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 11/13 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number Unfiled; Related [+] Attorney Priya Bhoplay Vivian added to party American Expediting Logistics, LLC(pty:dft) filed by American Expediting Logistics, LLC.(Vivian, Priya)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8716986
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet