New York Southern District Court
Judge:Valerie E Caproni
Case #: 1:24-cv-08634
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1442nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday May 12, 2025 4:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Chemguard Inc.
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC,
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.,
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
Chemdesign Products Inc.
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
Defendant
The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.
Represented By
Jordan David Sagalowsky
Mayer Brown Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Plaintiff
Richard Curtsinger
Plaintiff
Michael Lask
Plaintiff
Michaela Hamrick
Plaintiff
Mitzi Dillard
Plaintiff
Joseph McElligott
Plaintiff
Nicholas Dafoe
Plaintiff
Pamela Pickard
Plaintiff
Peter Olson
Plaintiff
Quentin Cooper
Plaintiff
Tim Dail
Plaintiff
Robert Harris Jr
Plaintiff
Robert Sharkey
Plaintiff
Roy Shelley
Plaintiff
Scott Richardson
Plaintiff
Steven Endorf
Plaintiff
Willie Toomer
Plaintiff
Wesley Tweed
Plaintiff
Todd Young
Plaintiff
Timothy Cadwell
Plaintiff
James Williamson
Plaintiff
Akeem Evans
Plaintiff
Alton Robinson
Plaintiff
Anthony Grabinski
Plaintiff
Carolyn Clark
Plaintiff
Christina Grimes
Plaintiff
Clifford Owle
Plaintiff
David A. Sugars
Plaintiff
David Sugars
Plaintiff
David Timme
Plaintiff
Gregory Jackson
Plaintiff
Jacinto Lira
Plaintiff
James Lusk
Plaintiff
Larry Walden
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Brettler
Plaintiff
Jesse V. Craig
Plaintiff
Jesus Gandara
Plaintiff
John Grundon
Plaintiff
Joseph Grimes II
Plaintiff
Joseph Woodson
Plaintiff
Joyce Perry
Plaintiff
Kathy Menser
Plaintiff
Kenneth W Phillips
Plaintiff
Lanorris Sewell
Plaintiff
Larry Archibald


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, December 19, 2024
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Thu 12/19 12:44 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of South Carolina acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:24-cv-07385, filed on 12/18/2024. (vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
6 6 transfer MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order Wed 12/18 5:54 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 11/27/2024) (vba)
Related: [-]
transfer MDL Transfer Out Wed 12/18 5:55 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 service Certificate of Service Other Fri 11/22 3:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference, Dkt. 4 on November 22, 2024. Service was made by Mail and Email. Document filed by The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co...(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
4 4 4 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Thu 11/21 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/24/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/21/2024) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 11/20 8:25 AM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Jennifer H. Rearden is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 11/14 9:26 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 11/14 9:27 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 11/14 9:28 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 11/14 12:08 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Edgardo Ramos is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Thu 11/14 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (tro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/13 6:25 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co...(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11/13 6:24 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 11/13 6:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 158179/2023. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30181117).Document filed by The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co...(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial