New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lorna G Schofield
Case #: 1:24-cv-08635
Nature of Suit245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability
Cause28:1442nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 13, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.,
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
Defendant
E. I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Chemicals, Inc.
Defendant
Chemguard Inc.
Defendant
Chemdesign Products Inc.
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company,
Defendant
The 3M Company
Represented By
Jordan David Sagalowsky
Mayer Brown Llp (ny)
contact info
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Plaintiff
Shirley Floyd
Plaintiff
Cherylee Matthew
Plaintiff
Lucille Frichette
Plaintiff
Andre Dziegelewski
Plaintiff
Chris Lee Erbe
Plaintiff
Jonathan Flora
Plaintiff
Lonnie Hopkins
Plaintiff
Bert Fogg
Plaintiff
Steven Forget
Plaintiff
Ronald Fournier
Plaintiff
James Gilbert, Jr.
Plaintiff
Robert Lewis Howard
Plaintiff
Keith Giles
Plaintiff
Joseph Giuffre
Plaintiff
Charles Green
Plaintiff
Steven Griffiths
Plaintiff
Guy Henry
Plaintiff
Kelley Hinkle
Plaintiff
Melvin Hollandworth
Plaintiff
Richard Bowman
Plaintiff
Rodney Alday
Plaintiff
Marc Alling
Plaintiff
Edwin Among
Plaintiff
Craig Ankney
Plaintiff
James Back
Plaintiff
Alan M. Banion
Plaintiff
Michael Barcomb
Plaintiff
Manuel Barragan
Plaintiff
Audna Lee Bateman
Plaintiff
Lawrence Beck
Plaintiff
John Bertrand
Plaintiff
Raymond Bonham
Plaintiff
Kenneth Bonnette, Jr.
Plaintiff
John Drawbond
Plaintiff
Neenah Brown
Plaintiff
Steven Brown
Plaintiff
Kenneth Browning
Plaintiff
Bernabe Buhain
Plaintiff
Andrew Carpenter
Plaintiff
Melissa Carrion
Plaintiff
Gary Cates
Plaintiff
Philip Cavalcante
Plaintiff
Glenn Cawley
Plaintiff
James Citro
Plaintiff
Willie Cook
Plaintiff
William Steven Cosden
Plaintiff
Nehemiah Cushion


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, December 19, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 12/19 4:10 PM
ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that the initial conference and the deadline to file the joint letter and case management plan are ADJOURNED, sine die. Within fourteen days of any transfer of this case from the District of South Carolina to this District, the parties shall file a status letter informing the Court of the status of this case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/19/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
misc Received Acknowledgment (Electronic Case Transfer) Thu 12/19 4:18 PM
Received e-mail from the United States District Court - District of South Carolina acknowledging receipt of transferred case. Assigned Case Number: 2:24-cv-07386, filed on 12/18/2024. (vba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
5 5 transfer MDL Conditional Transfer Out Order Wed 12/18 5:56 PM
CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 11/27/2024) (vba)
Related: [-]
transfer MDL Transfer Out Wed 12/18 5:57 PM
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 12/06 6:18 PM
ORDER The parties shall call (855) 244-8681 and enter the access code 23111938649. IPTC MATERIALS DUE: January 22, 2025. Initial Conference set for 1/29/2025 at 04:10 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/6/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 11/14 10:07 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky re: Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 11/14 10:08 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jordan David Sagalowsky. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Frichette Lucille; Cherylee Matthew; Andre Dziegelewski. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 11/14 10:09 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 11/14 10:11 AM
Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 11/14 10:11 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/13 6:47 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 11/13 6:46 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 11/13 6:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152173/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30181192).Document filed by The 3M Company..(Sagalowsky, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint